Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-10051

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert L Jones
Case #: 1:23-ap-01000
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Cotten, Defendant
12522 State Hwy 31E
Brownsboro, TX 75756
Represented By
John Cotten
contact info
Defendant
Ryan L. Rollins, Defendant
4933 Crystal Creek
Abilene, TX 79606
Represented By
Ryan L. Rollins
contact info
Defendant
Jason McFadden, Defendant
6973 FM 1082
Abilene, TX 79601
Represented By
Jason McFadden
contact info
Defendant
Pamela R. Langley, Defendant
7447 FM 1226 S.
Hawley, TX 79525
Represented By
Pamela R. Langley
contact info
Defendant
Rajeev K. Karki, Defendant
6360 Manchester Court
Tyler, TX 75703
Represented By
Rajeev K. Karki
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Edwards, Defendant
13680 County Road 4200
Tyler, TX 75771
Represented By
Ronald Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Andrew I. Coleman, Defendant
6361 Manchester Court
Tyler, TX 75703
Represented By
Andrew I. Coleman
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Bloser, Defendant
11086 Westhaven Circle
Flint, TX 75762
Represented By
Ryan Bloser
contact info
Defendant
Richard "Kirk" Boswell, Defendant
2015 Brookhollow
Abilene, TX 79605
Represented By
Richard "Kirk" Boswell
contact info
Defendant
Charles Ashmore, Defendant
1703 Slaydon
Henderson, TX 75654
Represented By
Charles Ashmore
contact info
Defendant
Eric Anderson, Defendant
2334 Greenbriar Drive
Abilene, TX 79605
Represented By
Eric Anderson
contact info
Defendant
Michael R. Adkins, Defendant
608 Lilly Lane
Bullard, TX 75757
Represented By
Michael R. Adkins
contact info
Defendant
Marcus Gand, Defendant
5225 Shenandoah Drive
Abilene, TX 79605
Represented By
Marcus Gand
contact info
Defendant
Curtis Stanley, Defendant
605 W. Josephine Street
Weatherford, TX 76086
Represented By
Curtis Stanley
contact info
Defendant
Clay Boyce, Defendant
706 Maji Road
Whitehouse, TX 75791
Represented By
Clay Boyce
contact info
Defendant
David "Dave" Weatherly, Defendant
339 Alexandra
Tuscola, TX 79562
Represented By
David "Dave" Weatherly
contact info
Defendant
Randy Barbee, Defendant
11411 Country Road 335
Hawley, TX 79525
Represented By
Randy Barbee
contact info
Defendant
John Hyland, Defendant
4265 Rose Haven Ct
Suamico, WI 54313
Represented By
John Hyland
contact info
Defendant
Matt Higgins, Defendant
3157 CR 154
Tuscola, TX 79562
Represented By
Matt Higgins
contact info
Defendant
Jack W Shoemate, Defendant
910 Barksdale Creek Lane
Fairview, TX 75069
Represented By
Jack W Shoemate
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca Whitener, Defendant
1147 Elmwood
Abilene, TX 79605
Represented By
Rebecca Whitener
contact info
Defendant
Eric Sydow, Defendant
Samuel Engineering, Inc. 8450 E. Crescent Parkway Suite 200
Greenwood Village, CO 80111
Represented By
Eric Sydow
contact info
Defendant
Everod Samuel, Defendant
8450 E. Crescent Parkway Suite 200
Greenwood Village, CO 80111
Represented By
Everod Samuel
contact info
Defendant
Samuel Engineering, Inc., Defendant
8450 E. Crescent Parkway Suite 200
Greenwood Village, CO 80111
Represented By
Samuel Engineering, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Roddrick B. Newhouse, Chapter 7 Trustee
401 Century Plaza, Unit 715
Allen, TX 75013
Represented By
Joseph F Postnikoff
Rochelle Mccullough, LLP
contact info
Jerry C. Alexander
Passman And Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
130 130 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 05/07 11:22 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 129 Order granting motion to set hearing (related document128 ) Hearing to be held on 7/2/2025 at 01:30 PM Abilene WebEx for99 , Entered on 5/5/2025. (Noble, N.). Related document(s)99 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Samuel Engineering, Inc., Defendant Everod Samuel.
Monday, May 05, 2025
129 129 order Set hearing Mon 05/05 3:06 PM
Order granting motion to set hearing Related [+] Hearing to be held on 7/2/2025 at 01:30 PM Abilene WebEx for128 , Entered on 5/5/2025. (Noble, N.)
Related: [-] 128
128 128 motion Set hearing Mon 05/05 11:13 AM
Joint Motion to set hearin Related [+] Joint Motion to Reset the Hearing on Defendants Samuel Engineering, Inc. and Everod Samuel's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Everod Samuel, Samuel Engineering, Inc. (Johnson, Larry)
Related: [-] 99 Motion for summary judgment
Att: 1 Proposed Order