Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 5:23-cv-01308
Nature of Suit111 Civil - Miscellaneous
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2023
Re-opened:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 2:24 PM EDT
Defendant
LANCASTER HOST, LLC
2300 LINCOLN HIGHWAY EAST
LANCASTER, PA 17602
Represented By
JASON CONFAIR
Saxton & Stump, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHLOMIE BIDERMAN
11 BRIARWOOD LANE
SUFFEN, NY 10901
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID BIDIRICI
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
MOSHE HELLMAN
1662 48TH ST
BROOKLYN, NY 11204
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
ROZI HELLMAN
HUSBAND AND WIFE 1662 48TH ST
BROOKLYN, NY 11204
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS
4 KENYON DRIVE
LAKEWOOD, NJ 08701
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
ABE OSINA
6031 NORTH CENTRAL PARK AVE
CHICAGO, IL 60659
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
SURIE OSINA
HUSBAND AND WIFE 6031 NORTH CENTRAL PARK AVE
CHICAGO, IL 60659
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
EMANUEL POLLAK
525 WEST END AVE #4A
New York, NY 10024
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK
HUSBAND AND WIFE 525 WEST END AVE #4A
NEW YORK, NY 10024
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
SIMCHA SHAIN
100 GUDZ ROAD
LAKEWOOD, NJ 08701
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTHER WOLF
HUSBAND AND WIFE 136 SUTTON PLACE SOUTH
LAWRENCE, NY 10059
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
MAURICE WOLF
136 SUTTON PLACE SOUTH
LAWRENCE, NY 10059
Represented By
Stephen Mullkoff
Stephen Mullkoff, Esquire
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/28 3:24 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 3/28/25. 3/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
35 35 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 08/05 8:33 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54 (DI 27), IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/2/24.8/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/15 10:26 AM
ORDER THAT THE E-MAILED MOTION REQUEST FROM ALL PARTIES TO CANCEL THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (DOC. NO. 33 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/14/24.5/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/15 10:25 AM
EMAIL MOTION REQUEST FROM ALL PARTIES TO CANCEL THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/07 1:36 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/20/2024, AT 9:30 AM, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/7/24. 5/7/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Status Conference Tue 05/07 1:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Status Conference held on 5/2/24. (amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/29 11:42 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/2/2024, AT 10:00 AM, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 4/29/24. 4/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/17 3:06 PM
NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE HEY'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. (amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 04/11 12:29 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE HEY. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT JUDGE HEYS CHAMBERS TO SCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR A TIME THAT JUDGE HEY DEEMS APPROPRIATE. WE TEMPORARILY BUT INDEFINITELY STAY ALL DEADLINES RELATING TO MOTIONS FOR FEES AND COSTS, INCLUDING BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (DI 27). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 4/11/24. 4/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
27 27 motion Attorney Fees Wed 04/10 4:36 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54 filed by LANCASTER HOST, LLC.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service.(CONFAIR, JASON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/09 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF (Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/08 9:22 AM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE THIS CASE FROM STAY AND PLACE IT BACK ON THE ACTIVE DOCKET. WE WILL HOLD A CASE MANAGEMENT VIDEOCONFERENCE OVER MICROSOFT TEAMS ON MAY 21, 2024 AT 10:00A.M. AND WILL SEND A VIDEOCONFERENCE LINK BY E-MAIL TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. THE PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN MAY 14, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 4/8/24. 4/8/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
24 24 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Tue 11/07 8:05 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re23 Transcript - PDF, 11/6/23 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (rf, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Transcript - PDF Tue 11/07 7:58 AM
TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 8/15/23, before Judge MURPHY. Court Reporter/Transcriber WRITERS CRAMP, INC.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2024. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/25 2:04 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL STAY THIS CASE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 10/25/23. 10/25/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Statement Wed 10/25 1:27 PM
Statement Joint Statement by SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF. (Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/18 1:39 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (DI 8) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION (BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY) IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER, AND NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 25, 2023, FILE JOINT OR SEPARATE STATEMENTS SETTING FORTH THEIR POSITIONS AND ANY ARGUMENT ON WHETHER THIS CASE SHOULD PROCEED INTO DISCOVERY OR BE STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF GREENWALD CATERERS INC. V. LANCASTER HOST LLC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 10/18/23.10/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
19 19 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 08/15 5:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY Motion Hearing held on 8/15/23 re8 First MOTION to Dismiss the "Second Cause of Action" in Plaintiffs' Complain Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(6) filed by LANCASTER HOST, LLC Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
18 18 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 07/27 12:59 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LANCASTER HOST, LLC.(CONFAIR, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/26 12:11 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT LANCASTER HOST, LLC SHALL FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NO LATER THAN JULY 28, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/26/23. 7/26/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 07/06 11:39 AM
ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ON AUGUST 15, 2023 AT 1:30P.M. IN COURTROOM 3B. DISCOVERY IN THE CASE IS STAYED (ABSENT AGREEMENT OF ALL PARTIES) PENDING FURTHER ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/6/23. 7/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
15 15 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 07/05 11:32 AM
RESPONSE in Support re8 First MOTION to Dismiss the "Second Cause of Action" in Plaintiffs' Complain Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(6) Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the "Second Cause of Action" in Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) filed by LANCASTER HOST, LLC. (CONFAIR, JASON)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Statement Wed 07/05 11:28 AM
Statement JOINT, Sect. 5 Policies and Procedures by SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF. (Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Discovery Plan Wed 07/05 11:00 AM
Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/28 8:31 AM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHOULD CONFER AND SUBMIT A JOINT STATEMENT OF THEIR POSITIONS, NO LATER THAN JULY 5, 2023, ON WHETHER DISCOVERY SHOULD PROCEED WHILE THE RULE 12 MOTION IS PENDING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/27/23. 6/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/27 2:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 First MOTION to Dismiss the "Second Cause of Action" in Plaintiffs' Complain Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(6) filed by SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF. (Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/09 3:16 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 6/28/23. DEFENDANTS REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 7/5/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/9/23. 6/9/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 06/09 1:21 PM
STIPULATION by LANCASTER HOST, LLC. (CONFAIR, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 06/07 4:33 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss the "Second Cause of Action" in Plaintiffs' Complain Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(6) filed by LANCASTER HOST, LLC.Brief, Entry of Appearance.(CONFAIR, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the "Second Cause of Action" in Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FED.R.CIVP. 12(b)(6),
Att: 2 Supplement Entry of Appearance
Sunday, May 21, 2023
7 7 service Certificate of Service Sun 05/21 8:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF (Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
6 6 minutes Status Conference Fri 04/14 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY Status Conference held on 4/14/23. (amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/10 1:44 PM
ORDER THAT THE COURT RESCHEDULES THE STATUS CONFERENCE AND WILL HEAR ARGUMENT ON THE MOTION ON APRIL 14, 2023 AT 10:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3B. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 23-1308 STEPHEN MULLKOFF, ESQ., SHALL ATTEND THE APRIL 14, 2023 CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 4/10/23. 4/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/06 1:34 PM
ORDER OF 4/6/23 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR., TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOHN F. MURPHY, AS RELATED TO GREENWALD CATERERS INC., V. LANCASTER HOST LLC CIVIL NO. 22-0811 SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE WYLESOL ON 4/6/23. 4/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/06 9:26 AM
NOTICE by SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF Designation Form (Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 04/06 9:27 AM
Jury Trial Demanded by Plaintiffs SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, DAVID BIDIRICI, MOSHE HELLMAN, ROZI HELLMAN, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, ABE OSINA, SURIE OSINA, EMANUEL POLLAK, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, SIMCHA SHAIN, ESTHER WOLF, MAURICE WOLF. (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Thu 04/06 1:57 PM
Doc. 4 Mailed to Unrep. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/06 9:26 AM
Summons Issued as to LANCASTER HOST, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/6/23 (dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 04/05 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BPAEDC-16609190.), filed by MOSHE HELLMAN, ABE OSINA, SHLOMIE BIDERMAN, SIMCHA SHAIN, SURIE OSINA, ESTHER WOLF, ROZI HELLMAN, DAVID BILDIRIEI, EVELYN CHAVA POLLAK, MAURICE WOLF, YITZCHOK HERSKOVITS, EMANUEL POLLAK.(Mullkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Contract at issue
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 04/05 4:24 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions need to be answered and a signature is required. (sbt)
Related: [-]