New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Referred: Sarah Netburn
Case #: 1:23-cv-02844
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Cause18:2333 Civil Remedies: Anti-Terrorism Act of 1991
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 6:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Represented By
Michael Kerry Kellogg
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick Pllc (dc)
contact info
Mark Charles Hansen
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick Pllc (dc)
contact info
Gregory G. Rapawy
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick Pllc (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Daniel L. Maher
Represented By
Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldfarb LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel R. Maher
Represented By
Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldfarb LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph F. Maher
Represented By
Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldfarb LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Maher
Represented By
Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldfarb LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
38 38 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Wed 03/05 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ORAL ARGUMENT proceeding held on 2/28/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Transcript Wed 03/05 3:56 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 2/28/2025 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa O'Brien, (212) 805-0320. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/26/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2025.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
36 36 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 02/18 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 12/10/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Transcript Tue 02/18 4:17 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 12/10/2024 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/11/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 02/11 7:20 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/4/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Transcript Tue 02/11 7:11 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2025 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2025.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
32 32 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 12/17 6:46 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/10/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Transcript Tue 12/17 6:37 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/10/2024 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2025.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/09 1:26 PM
ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant Al Rajhi Bank's renewed motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment for lack of personal jurisdiction (ECF No. 9785 ) is scheduled for December 10, 2024 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/9/2024) ( Oral Argument set for 12/10/2024 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
29 29 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 09/03 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/31/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Transcript Tue 09/03 5:22 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/31/2024 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: George Malinowski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2024.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
27 27 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 07/29 5:59 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; terminating (10067) Motion to Unseal; terminating (10071) Motion to Unseal; terminating (10073) Motion to Seal; terminating (10075) Motion to Seal; terminating (10108) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The FBI's request to maintain limited redactions regarding the identification of FBI witnesses throughout the motion papers, averments of fact, and exhibits is GRANTED, without prejudice to future, specific unsealing applications. Saudi Arabia's request to keep some of its exhibits under seal and to redact others is DENIED. The parties are directed to promptly file on the public docket-at 9:00 AM on Wednesday, July 31, 2024-a set of motion papers, averments of fact, and exhibits that comply with this decision, to the extent practicable. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 10067, 10071, 10073, 10075, and 10108. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/29/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 5:02 PM
ORDER: This court would welcome any joint submission regarding redactions. However, the request to adjourn the July 31, 2024 oral argument date is DENIED. Prior to the oral argument, this Court will consider any agreement regarding redactions from the parties. The Court will consider any joint submission prior to July 31, 2024 if it is submitted no later than July 26, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/22/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (sgz)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 07/22 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/17/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Transcript Mon 07/22 2:54 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/17/2024 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2024.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
minutes Case Management Conference Thu 07/18 8:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Case Management Conference held on 7/17/2024. Plaintiffs Counsel: Sean P. Carter, Robert T. Haefele, James Gavin Simpson, Saudi Arabia Counsel: Gregory G. Rapawy, Dallah Avco Counsel: Robert K. Kr; FBI Counsel: Sarah S. Normand CBS: Matthew L. Schafer and Court Reporter Present Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/16 9:00 AM
ORDER, This Court has reviewed the underlying submissions relating to the sealing of certain documents. In light of the volume of challenged documents and their relatedness to the underlying motions to dismiss, in consultation with Magistrate Judge Netburn, the sealing issue is withdrawn from her jurisdiction. This Court will conduct the conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 17, 2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 11A in the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. At that conference, the Court will discuss with the parties the process and timing of a resolution of the dispute over which documents should remain under seal. The Court will also canvas the parties on how best to proceed with the July 31, 2024 oral argument. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/17/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/15/24) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (yv)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/15 6:44 PM
ORDER: This Court has reviewed the underlying submissions relating to the sealing of certain documents. In light of the volume of challenged documents and their relatedness to the underlying motions to dismiss, in consultation with Magistrate Judge Netburn, the sealing issue is withdrawn from her jurisdiction. This Court will conduct the conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 17, 2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 11A in the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. At that conference, the Court will discuss with the parties the process and timing of a resolution of the dispute over which documents should remain under seal. The Court will also canvas the parties on how best to proceed with the July 31, 2024 oral argument. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/15/2024) ( Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/26 2:01 PM
ORDER: The July 10, 2024 oral argument on Defendant Dallah Avco Trans Arabia Company's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 93621) and Defendant Kingdom of Saudi Arabia's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 9368) is adjourned to July 31, 2024 at 9:45 a.m. Plaintiffs' request for a case management conference regarding sealing issues in anticipation of oral argument (see ECF No. 9901) is referred to Magistrate Judge Netburn. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/26/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 06/26 3:24 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 7/31/2024 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/30 11:42 AM
ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant Dallah Avco Trans Arabia Company's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 9362) and Defendant Kingdom of Saudi Arabia's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 9368) is scheduled for July 10, 2024 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/30/2024) ( Oral Argument set for 7/10/2024 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 12:23 PM
ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (9641) Motion for Shalom D. Jacks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (dsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
18 18 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 02/27 10:52 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (9307) Motion for Reconsideration re (9307 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (9278) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions. Motion for Clarification or Partial Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Plaintiffs' motion for clarification is GRANTED. The Dismissal Order is clarified as follows: ( l) Plaintiffs' timely wrongful death and survival claims remain in this litigation; and (2) this Court has not yet ruled on the O'Neill Plaintiffs' class action allegations against Sudan or Saudi Arabia. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 9307. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/27/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/12 12:27 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the Havlish Plaintiffs, having reached a private settlementagreement with the law firms of Motley Rice LLC; Kreindler & Kreindler LLP;Speiser Krause, PC; and Anderson Kill PC, on behalf of their firms and clients, the Havlish Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for an Order Creating a Common BenefitFund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom (MDL Dkt. No. 4289 & 4291) ("the Motion"), is hereby dismissed with prejudice as against Motley RiceLLC, Kreindler & Kreindler LLP; Speiser Krause, PC; and Anderson Kill PC andtheir clients. Counsel for any other party with claims against the Islamic Republic of Iran impacted by the Motion may contact counsel for the Havlish Plaintiffs if interested in attempting to reach a private settlement of the Motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/12/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
16 16 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 09/15 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/6/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Transcript Fri 09/15 2:02 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 9/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
14 14 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 07/10 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 6/26/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Transcript Mon 07/10 2:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/26/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
12 12 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 04/24 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ORAL ARGUMENT proceeding held on 4/19/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Transcript Mon 04/24 2:38 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 4/19/2023 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/17 5:24 PM
ORDER granting (689) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (691) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (1076) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (1078) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (9005) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (9007) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (743) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (745) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (576) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (578) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (860) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (862) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (115) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:01-cv-10132-GBD-SN; granting (635) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (637) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; granting (779) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (781) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; granting (716) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (718) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; granting (457) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (459) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; granting (578) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (580) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; granting (416) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (418) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (764) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (766) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; granting (250) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (252) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; granting (413) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (415) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; granting (1947) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (1949) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; granting (114) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (116) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; granting (295) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (297) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; granting (244) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (246) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-07236-GBD; granting (457) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (459) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; granting (650) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (652) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (114) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (116) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; granting (166) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (168) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; granting (126) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (128) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; granting (158) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (160) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; granting (157) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (159) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; granting (157) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (159) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; granting (157) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (159) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; granting (269) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (271) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; granting (124) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (126) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; granting (151) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (153) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; granting (114) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (116) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; granting (150) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (152) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (122) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (122) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; granting (118) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (121) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; granting (102) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; granting (114) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (116) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; granting (106) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (108) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (96) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; granting (252) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (254) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (216) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (218) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (215) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (217) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (192) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (194) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (227) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (229) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (106) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (73) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; granting (178) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; granting (106) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (108) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-10820-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11346-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11361-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11422-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11423-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11431-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11433-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11459-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11479-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11481-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11484-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11517-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11532-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11580-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11645-GBD-SN; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11713-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11717-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11724-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11727-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11743-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11745-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11748-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11754-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11755-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11757-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11761-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11762-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11768-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11769-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11772-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11773-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11774-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11775-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11776-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11780-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11781-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11784-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11785-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11795-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11798-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11800-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11803-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11804-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11810-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11812-GBD-SN; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11814-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11831-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11833-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN; granting (184) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (186) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11839-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11841-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11847-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11849-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11854-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11855-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11856-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11857-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11862-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11866-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11867-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11868-GBD-SN; granting (194) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (196) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11872-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN; granting (148) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (150) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (138) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (140) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (165) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (167) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11886-GBD-SN; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11890-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11891-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11892-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11893-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11896-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11899-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11909-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11910-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11911-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11921-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11927-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11929-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11939-GBD-SN; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11942-GBD-SN; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11944-GBD-SN; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11949-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11951-GBD-SN; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (86) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11983-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11992-GBD-SN; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11996-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12001-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12005-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12009-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12010-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12015-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12026-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12034-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12039-GBD-SN; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (96) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12041-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12043-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12044-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12052-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12060-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12067-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12071-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12085-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12100-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12109-GBD-SN; granting (130) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (132) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12141-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12143-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12144-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12145-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12224-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12256-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12257-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (182) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (220) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12280-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12286-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12291-GBD-SN; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12294-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12298-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12301-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12305-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12309-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12326-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12328-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12334-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12335-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12336-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12337-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12338-GBD-SN; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; granting (147) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (149) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12343-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12344-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12346-GBD-SN; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (73) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12347-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12348-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12349-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12350-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12351-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12352-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12353-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12354-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12358-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12360-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12362-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12368-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12369-GBD-SN; granting (112) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (114) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12372-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12374-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12375-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12376-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12377-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12378-GBD-SN; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12383-GBD-SN; granting (208) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (210) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12398-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12399-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12402-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00003-GBD-SN; granting (290) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (292) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00012-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00025-GBD-SN; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00027-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00028-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00030-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00031-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00039-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00040-GBD-SN; granting (141) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (143) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (121) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00045-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00048-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-00050-GBD-SN; granting (454) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (456) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; granting (536) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (538) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; granting (151) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (153) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN; granting (138) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (140) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN; granting (151) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (153) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (139) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00315-GBD-SN; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00340-GBD-SN; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00354-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00355-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00411-GBD-SN; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00412-GBD-SN; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00415-GBD-SN; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-00416-GBD-SN; granting (1205) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (1207) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; granting (447) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (449) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; granting (143) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (145) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-09376-GBD-SN; granting (128) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (130) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-09387-GBD-SN; granting (456) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (458) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10366-GBD-SN; granting (130) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (132) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10460-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10615-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10657-GBD-SN; granting (121) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (123) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-01394-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-03505-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-06247-GBD-SN; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-07679-GBD; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-10239-GBD; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:22-cv-01188-GBD; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:22-cv-05193-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:22-cv-10823-GBD-SN; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (6) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:23-cv-02844-GBD-SN; granting (9) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:23-cv-02845-GBD-SN; granting (9) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:23-cv-02846-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
9 9 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Thu 04/13 6:03 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/11/23 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Transcript Thu 04/13 5:49 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/11/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 04/13 3:55 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew S. Leddicotte in Support re: (9007 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Republic of the Sudan, Republic of the Sudan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Leddicotte, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/13 3:29 PM
MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Republic of the Sudan, Republic of the Sudan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Leddicotte, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Matthew S. Leddicotte's Motion to Withdraw
5 5 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 04/13 2:33 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew S. Leddicotte in Support re: (9005 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Leddicotte, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/13 1:27 PM
MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Leddicotte, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Matthew S. Leddicotte's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Friday, April 07, 2023
misc Case Opening Fee Due Fri 04/07 11:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: As per Order document #1 in this matter and document # 8984 in case 03-md-1570. Use the event Civil Case Opening Fee Payment to pay $402.00 filing fee. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
3 3 464 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/05 4:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (ORIGINALLY FILED IN CASE 1:17-CV-2003 DOC # 20) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,, against All Defendants.Document filed by Plaintiffs listed (Kreindler, James).(gp)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 04/05 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT (ORIGINALLY FILED IN CASE 1:17-CV-2003 DOC #1) COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13440429)Document filed by Gwynetta Rossi, Miltiadis Ahladiotis, Mary Buckley, Kyle Adams-Floyd, Mary Adderley, John Ashton, Effie Ahladiotis-Salloum, Josephinme Alger, Donna Albert, Michael Adams, Kathleen Ashton, Colleen Amato, Kimberly Trimingham-Aiken, Carmen Agnes, Lorraine Abad.(Kreindler, James).(gp)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs order Order Wed 04/05 1:11 PM
ORDER SEVERING CASES (ORIGINAL ORDER FILED IN CASE 1:03-MD-1570 (GBD) (SN) DOC # 8984) ORDER terminating (8644) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating (8794) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; terminating (1786) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating (1880) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; terminating (192) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating (218) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:02-cv-07236-GBD; terminating (259) Motion to Sever in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; terminating (114) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating (121) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating (126) Motion to Sever in case 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN. The Court ORDERS that all claims by the Maher Plaintiffs against all defendants are severed from Ashton/Bauer nunc pro tunc to January 9, 2020. The Maher Plaintiffs' claims in Ryan and Grazioso will continue to be prosecuted in those cases and this order does not impact the status of those claims. The docket entries listed in Appendix A-as well as any other service events, defaults, discovery, filings, proceedings, and orders previously applicable to the Maher Plaintiffs claims in Ryan-are deemed incorporated into Ryan and are applicable to and binding upon the Maher Plaintiffs in Ryan. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of the Court to open three new cases to be styled Maher, et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, et al., Maher, et al. v. Islamic Emirate of Afghanistan a/k/a The Taliban, et al., and Maher, et al. v. Republic of the Sudan. These three new cases shall be accepted into this multidistrict litigation case, In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, No. 03-md-01570, assigned to Judge George B. Daniels, and referred to Judge Sarah Netburn in accordance with ECF No. 3418. Once these cases have been opened, the Clerk's Office will contact counsel to arrange payment of the filing fees. The Maher Plaintiffs' severed claims (other than those prosecuted in Ryan and Grazioso) are transferred into these three new cases as prescribed in Appendices B, C, and D. This order shall be filed in each new case. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to docket in each case the complaints, amended complaints, and entries of default included in the list of docket entries in Appendices B, C, and D. All docket entries listed in Appendices B, C, and D-as well as any other complaints, service events, defaults, discovery, filings, proceedings, and orders previously applicable to the Maher Plaintiffs' claims against the relevant defendants-are deemed incorporated into the new cases and are applicable to and binding upon the Maher Plaintiffs in each of the new cases. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 8644, 8794, and 8885 and the related motions in Ashton v. Al Qaeda, No. 02-cv-06977, ECF Nos. 1786, 1880, and 1918; Bauer, No. 02-cv-07236, ECF Nos. 192, 218, and 227; Ashton v. KSA, No. 17-cv-02003, ECF No. 259; and Ryan, No. 20-cv-00266, ECF Nos. 114, 121, and 126. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/4/2023). (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/05 4:25 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 04/05 5:02 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Consolidation - MDL Wed 04/05 5:04 PM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN.. (gp)
Related: [-]