Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:23-cv-00753
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2023
Terminated:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 11:30 AM EDT
Defendant
All Wood Cabinetry LLC
Represented By
Michael Joseph DeMaio, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Amy Kathleen Recla
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Beam
Represented By
Barbra Anne Stern
Law Office Of Barbra Stern PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ideal Cabinetry LLC
Terminated: 05/31/2023
210 Century Blvd
Bartow, FL 33830


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 01, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/01 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (jointly filed) by All Wood Cabinetry LLC. (DeMaio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
31 31 order Order Thu 02/29 2:47 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the "Report of Mediation" (Doc. 30 ), this cause is hereby dismissed as to the last remaining Defendant, All Wood Cabinetry, L.L.C., without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60-day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 2/29/2024. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
30 30 adr Mediation report Fri 02/23 3:30 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on Zoom. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Evans-Putney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 01/30 12:55 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Wednesday, February 21, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Karen Evans-Putney, Esquire. (DeMaio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/29 4:35 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The "Unopposed Joint Motion for Alternate Mediator" (Doc. 27 ) is granted. Karen Evans-Putney, Esq. is substituted as the mediator in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 1/29/2024. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/26 4:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Alternate Mediator Selection by All Wood Cabinetry LLC. (DeMaio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
26 26 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 10/02 1:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/5/2024; Dispositive motions due by 7/8/2024; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/4/2023; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/4/2024; Rebuttal disclosure of expert report due by 2/5/2024; Pretrial Conference set for JANUARY 21, 2025, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Trial set for term commencing 2/3/2025 before Judge Thomas P. Barber. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 3 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/15/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/2/2023. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of hearing Wed 09/27 3:58 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Conference set for MARCH 27, 2024, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 09/27 3:57 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 9/27/2023. Court Reporter: Rebekah Lockwood (SRC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
23 23 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 09/14 9:29 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 8 Amended Complaint by All Wood Cabinetry LLC.(AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of hearing Thu 08/17 10:38 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for SEPTEMBER 27, 2023, at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
21 21 misc Case Management Report Wed 08/09 2:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/07 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jessica Beam. (Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/07 4:22 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by All Wood Cabinetry LLC. (DeMaio, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 08/07 4:21 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by All Wood Cabinetry LLC. Related case(s): No (DeMaio, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of appearance Mon 08/07 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph DeMaio, Jr on behalf of All Wood Cabinetry LLC (DeMaio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
16 16 order Order Tue 08/01 9:16 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Based on the response (Doc. 15 ), the order to show cause (Doc. 12) is discharged. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/1/2023. (ANL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC Tue 08/01 3:48 PM
Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 9/13/2023. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
15 15 misc Response to order to show cause Mon 07/31 5:02 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 12 Order to show cause filed by Jessica Beam. (Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of service executed Mon 07/31 5:00 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on July 13, 2023 by Jessica Beam as to All Wood Cabinetry LLC. (Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Wed 07/26 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Kathleen Recla on behalf of All Wood Cabinetry LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] cla, Amy
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
12 12 order Order to show cause Tue 07/25 3:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon review of the file, it appears that Plaintiff Jessica Beam has not yet perfected service on Defendant. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE by a written response filed on or before August 1, 2023, for failing to perfect service on Defendant within ninety (90) days of the filing of the complaint (Doc. 1 ). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Failure to respond will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/25/2023. (ANL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
11 11 service Summons issued Wed 07/05 2:01 PM
SUMMONS issued as to All Wood Cabinetry LLC. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/30 1:38 PM
NOTICE by Jessica Beam re8 Amended Complaint(Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint
9 9 service Proposed summons Fri 06/30 1:32 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jessica Beam. (Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/31 6:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Wood Cabinetry LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Jessica Beam. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Jessica Beam.(Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 05/25 10:19 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's "Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend" (Doc. 6 ) is granted to the extent Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, which should be served in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 5/25/2023. (ANL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
6 6 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 05/24 6:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, by Jessica Beam.(Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 20, 2023
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/20 2:55 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/20 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
3 3 service Summons issued Thu 04/06 3:48 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Ideal Cabinetry LLC. (LSS)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/06 12:45 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:23-cv-753-TPB-AAS. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/05 5:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Jessica Beam with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20693555) filed by Jessica Beam.(Stern, Barbra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Summons