THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH v. META PLATFORMS, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | William S Stickman |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00577 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:47 PM EDT |
Defendant
BYTEDANCE INC.
|
|
Defendant
BYTEDANCE LTD
|
|
Defendant
FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
GOOGLE LLC
|
|
Defendant
INSTAGRAM, LLC
|
|
Defendant
META PAYMENTS INC.
|
|
Defendant
META PLATFORMS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
SICULUS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
SNAP INC.
|
|
Defendant
TIKTOK, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TIKTOK, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TIKTOK, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
YOUTUBE, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH
|
Represented By
|
1. | Pittsburgh Public Schools file federal lawsuit against multiple social media platforms (cbsnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/11/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
transfer
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer
Fri 04/28 4:13 PM
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jma) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Fri 04/28 4:16 PM
Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of California. (jma) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
transfer
Conditional Transfer Order
Mon 04/24 10:48 AM
Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jma) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:37 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. YOUTUBE, LLC served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:36 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. TIKTOK, LTD. served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:35 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. TIKTOK, LLC served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:35 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. TIKTOK, INC. served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:34 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. SICULUS, INC. served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:33 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. META PLATFORMS, INC. served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:33 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. META PAYMENTS INC. served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:32 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. INSTAGRAM, LLC served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:31 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. GOOGLE LLC served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:30 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. BYTEDANCE LTD served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:29 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. BYTEDANCE INC. served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Tue 04/18 9:52 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
271
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/14 9:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against BYTEDANCE INC., BYTEDANCE LTD, FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC, GOOGLE LLC, INSTAGRAM, LLC, META PAYMENTS INC., META PLATFORMS, INC., SICULUS, INC., SNAP INC., TIKTOK, INC., TIKTOK, LLC, TIKTOK, LTD., YOUTUBE, LLC, filed by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Fri 04/14 8:14 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Amend. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Caption and Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that said motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file its Amended Complaint and the caption shall be amended to reflect The School District of Pittsburgh. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/14/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend
Thu 04/13 3:32 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, and Caption by PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (Levin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Proposed Amended Complaint) | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/12 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara J. Watkins on behalf of PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (Watkins, Sara) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/12 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by D. Aaron Rihn on behalf of PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (Rihn, D.) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/06 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to BYTEDANCE INC., BYTEDANCE LTD, FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC, GOOGLE LLC, INSTAGRAM, LLC, META PAYMENTS INC., META PLATFORMS, INC., SICULUS, INC., SNAP INC., TIKTOK, INC., TIKTOK, LLC, TIKTOK, LTD., YOUTUBE, LLC. (jma) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Bytedance, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Google, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Instagram, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Meta Platforms, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Meta, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Siculus, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Snap, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Tiktok LLC, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Tiktok LTD, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Tiktok, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Youtube | ||
1 | 1
271
pgs
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Thu 04/06 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT against BYTEDANCE INC., BYTEDANCE LTD, FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC, GOOGLE LLC, INSTAGRAM, LLC, META PAYMENTS INC., META PLATFORMS, INC., SICULUS, INC., SNAP INC., TIKTOK, INC., TIKTOK, LLC, TIKTOK, LTD., YOUTUBE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7626765), filed by PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (jma) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)
Thu 04/06 12:01 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/13/2023. (jma) |