California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:23-cv-00615
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2023
Terminated:Jun 01, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 2:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Kristin Gaspar
Plaintiff
Jeremy Kron
43 Sunbeam Way
Rancho Cordova, CA 95670

GPO Apr 06 2023
ORDER Denying Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Sua Sponte Dismissing Complaint [Doc. No. 2]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/6/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 01, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 06/02 9:07 AM
Dismissal Without Prejudice [Doc. No.6 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/1/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 06/01 2:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File or in the Alternative, to Dismiss by Jeremy Kron. (anh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/02 2:10 PM
ORDER Re Motion for Extension [Doc. No.4 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/2/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/02 11:38 AM
NOTICE Regarding Dismissal by Jeremy Kron (anh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/06 5:04 PM
ORDER Denying Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Sua Sponte Dismissing Complaint [Doc. No.2 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/6/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/06 10:13 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Kron. (mjw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/6/2023) (mjw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/06 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kristin Gaspar, IFP Filed, filed by Jeremy Kron. The new case number is 3:23-cv-615-CAB-JLB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet