Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-07738
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2023
Re-opened:May 22, 2023
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 12:24 PM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
PAUL CLARK
Represented By
DEBORAH K LEVY
Junelle & Associates Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 22, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Order Reopening Case Mon 05/22 9:47 AM
ORDER - The plaintiff's motions listed on Exhibit A are GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to VACATE the prior dismissal orders and REOPEN the cases and return them to the docket of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/22/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, May 15, 2023
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 05/15 8:29 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:3 MOTION to Reopen Case. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
3 3 motion Reopen Case Fri 05/12 3:47 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by PAUL CLARK. (LEVY, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Share File Images
Friday, May 05, 2023
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/09 11:51 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/06 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7807705.), filed by PAUL CLARK. (LEVY, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet