New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Referred: Gary Stein
Case #: 1:23-cv-02880
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 6:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard Irizzary
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Kimmel
Akerman LLP
contact info
Brittany A. Buccellato
Akerman LLP
contact info
Cassidy Mara
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Kimmel
Akerman LLP
contact info
Brittany A. Buccellato
Akerman LLP
contact info
Cassidy Mara
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
St Luke's-Roosevelt Hospital Center
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Kimmel
Akerman LLP
contact info
Brittany A. Buccellato
Akerman LLP
contact info
Cassidy Mara
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lloyd Vasquez
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Kimmel
Akerman LLP
contact info
Brittany A. Buccellato
Akerman LLP
contact info
Cassidy Mara
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hubert Lopez
Represented By
Joseph Jeziorkowski
Valiant Law
contact info
Peter Hans Cooper
Cilenti & Cooper, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
84 84 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 04/07 12:00 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:67 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Richard Irizzary, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., St Luke's-Roosevelt Hospital Center, Lloyd Vasquez..(Kimmel, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
83 83 respm Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion Mon 04/07 11:58 AM
REPLY AFFIRMATION of Kevin Reid, dated April 4, 2025 in Support re:67 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Richard Irizzary, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., St Luke's-Roosevelt Hospital Center, Lloyd Vasquez..(Kimmel, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]