Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:23-cv-00402
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2023
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 11:32 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc.
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Chad Burt
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sheila Folk
Counter Defendant
Travel Industry Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Melissa Dangond
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt & Gilchrist, P.A.
contact info
Ava K. Doppelt
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, & Gilchrist, PA
contact info
Defendant
A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc.
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Defendant
Chad Burt
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Defendant
Steve Muraca
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Travel Industry Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Melissa Dangond
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt & Gilchrist, P.A.
contact info
Ava K. Doppelt
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, & Gilchrist, PA
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Sheila Folk
Third Party Plaintiff
A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc.
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Chad Burt
Represented By
Crystal T. Broughan
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Logan Kyle McEwen
Marks Gray, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
37 37 misc Copyright Report Tue 05/14 3:27 PM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (LMW)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 05/14 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
35 35 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/13 4:58 PM
**DOCKETED IN ERROR** ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to11 the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/13/2024. (VNG) Modified on 5/13/2024 to edit docket text and remove pdf per Chambers (MDC).
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/13 4:39 PM
ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to 33 the Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk should terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/13/2024. (VNG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/07 4:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC. (Doppelt, Ava)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 04/11 1:51 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Case Management and Scheduling Order to the extent that the discovery deadline is extended to 5/6/2024 and the dispositive and Daubert motion deadline is extended to 6/3/2024. All other deadlines and settings remain as set by the Case Management and Scheduling Order 14 . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/11/2024. (SRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
31 31 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 04/05 9:37 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend14 Case Management Scheduling Order by All Defendants. (Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/06 12:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Claim (Dkt. #22) filed by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt. (McEwen, Logan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
29 29 motion Dismiss Mon 11/20 1:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Claim (Dkt. #22) by Sheila Folk. (Doppelt, Ava)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/31 4:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt. (McEwen, Logan)
Related: [-]
27 27 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Tue 10/31 4:15 PM
ORDER granting 24 the plaintiff's motion to withdraw admissions made through belated responses to the defendants' requests for admission under Rule 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The plaintiff's admissions-through-delay are withdrawn and replaced with the proposed responses included with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/31/2023. (DS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/23 12:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Withdraw Admissions filed by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt, Steve Muraca. (McEwen, Logan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
25 25 motion Dismiss Tue 10/10 5:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC.(Doppelt, Ava)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
24 24 motion Withdraw Tue 10/10 2:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Admissions by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC.(Doppelt, Ava)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
23 23 service Waiver of service executed Tue 10/10 8:49 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/9/23 by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt as to Sheila Folk. (McEwen, Logan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 09/18 1:53 PM
Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sheila Folk, Travel Industry Solutions, LLC by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt.(Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 09/18 10:52 AM
ORDER granting 19 the motion to amend the pleading. By September 22, 2023, A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., and Chad Burt must file the amended pleading attached to the motion, Doc. 19-1, as a standalone docket entry. By October 16, 2023, A.S.A.P. and Burt must serve process on, or obtain a waiver of service of process from, Sheila Folk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/18/2023. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/24 6:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Add Counterclaims with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC. (Dangond, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
19 19 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 08/10 3:03 PM
MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Add Counterclaims with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt, Steve Muraca.(McEwen, Logan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim
Monday, August 07, 2023
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/07 5:23 PM
NOTICE by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt of Withdrawal of Counterclaim (McEwen, Logan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
17 17 cmp Crossclaim Tue 07/18 5:40 PM
CROSSCLAIM against Travel Industry Solutions, LLC, Sheila Folk filed by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt.(Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notated Draft Operating Agreement for TravDocs LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notated TIS May 21, 2021 phone call follow up,
Att: 3 Exhibit Emails dated June 2, 2021,
Att: 4 Exhibit Memo of Understanding dated June 1, 2021,
Att: 5 Exhibit Draft Term Sheet - Intellectual Property License and Business Restructuring,
Att: 6 Exhibit Emails dated July 7, 8 and 9, 2021,
Att: 7 Exhibit Emails dated August 24, 2021,
Att: 8 Exhibit Emails dated October 12, 2021,
Att: 9 Exhibit Email dated October 30, 2021,
Att: 10 Exhibit Emails dated between March 19, 2022 and April 12, 2022,
Att: 11 Exhibit Expenses Spreadsheet
Friday, June 09, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/09 3:10 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt, Steve Muraca.(Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A Travel Insurance Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B Webinar Screenshots,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C Webinar Travel Insurance Waiver,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D Comparison
Thursday, June 08, 2023
utility Case Referred to Mediation Thu 06/08 1:03 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
14 14 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 06/07 2:13 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2023; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/9/2024; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2024; Discovery due by 4/5/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/10/2024; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 5/3/2024; Pretrial statement due by 9/19/2024; All other motions due by 9/19/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/7/2024 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/7/2023.(AMM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
13 13 service Waiver of service executed Wed 05/31 4:34 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/13/23 by Chad Burt as to Chad Burt. (Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of service executed Wed 05/31 4:32 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/13/23 by Steve Muraca as to Steve Muraca. (Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of service executed Wed 05/31 4:31 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/13/23 by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc. as to A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc.. (Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/26 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt, Steve Muraca. (Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
9 9 misc Case Management Report Thu 05/25 5:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Doppelt, Ava)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 04/20 4:44 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC. Related case(s): No (Dangond, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/20 4:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC. (Dangond, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Mon 04/17 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Designation as Lead Counsel and Appearance by Crystal T. Broughan on behalf of A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt, Steve Muraca (Broughan, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/10 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/07 4:33 PM
NOTICE by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC re1 Complaint, Notice of Manual Filing Video Exhibit(Dangond, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix D
3 3 misc Copyright Report Fri 04/07 3:05 PM
Copyright Report sent to Washington. (BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibits A - F
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/07 9:59 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-402-TJC-PDB. (BCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/06 6:38 PM
COMPLAINT against A.S.A.P. Cruises, Inc., Chad Burt, Steve Muraca with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20698853) filed by Travel Industry Solutions, LLC.(Dangond, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet