Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00041
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Apr 07, 2023 1:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Jordy Scott Deboer (1)
Represented By
David Matthew Miller
Miller & Prothero
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2)
Represented By
Bryan P Whitaker
Bryan P Whitaker, Attorney At Law
contact info
Federal Public Defender - SPO
Spokane Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Caitlin A Baunsgard
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info

GPO Jul 24 2023
ORDER FOLLOWING DETENTION REVIEW HEARING as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1); denying 59 Defendant's Motion to Modify Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (LAS, Case Administrator)
GPO Aug 07 2023
ORDER GRANTING 63 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (AY, Case Administrator)
GPO Dec 13 2023
JUDGMENT as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). Counts 1, 2, & 3 - Dismissed; Count 4 - Incarceration: 120 months; Supervised Release: 5 years; Fine: Waived; and SPA: $100. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
GPO Jul 10 2024
JUDGMENT as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1), Count 4, Imprisonment: 240 months plus 32 months pursuant to 18 USC § 3147, to be served consecutively (total term is 272 months) (to run concurrent to sentence imposed in Case No. 2:22-CR-0094-TOR-2); Supervised Release: 5 years-concurrent; Fine: waived; Special Penalty Assessment: $100.00. Counts 1, 2, 3 are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)

Docket last updated: 04/07/2023 2:23 AM PDT
Thursday, March 30, 2023
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1), Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT re1 Criminal Complaint as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1), and Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Charges and Penalties as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (MO, Courtroom Deputy) . [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Charges and Penalties as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
7 7 NOTICE OF HEARING - By Court as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 4/3/2023 at 1:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 740 before Magistrate Judge Alexander C. Ekstrom. (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF HEARING - By Court as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 4/3/2023 at 1:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 740 before Magistrate Judge Alexander C. Ekstrom. (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE RESETTING HEARING - By Court as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on Complaint RESET for 3/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 740 before Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (Baunsgard, Caitlin) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (Baunsgard, Caitlin)[2:23-mj-00144-JAG] Modified on 4/6/2023 to term motion as of 4/4/2023, the date case was merged (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead).
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). On the basis of the sworn financial statement, the Court finds Defendant is financially unable to retain counsel. IT IS ORDERED the Federal Defenders of Eastern Washington are appointed to represent Defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code Sec. 3006A. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court Order on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (PMS, Law Clerk) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2) held on 3/31/2023. Related [+] (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/S-740. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
15 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS - CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (LTR, Case Administrator) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
17 17 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (LTR, Case Administrator) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT AND SETTING DETENTION HEARING as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 4/5/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 740. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (LTR, Case Administrator) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
19 19 APPOINTMENT ORDER. Type of Appointment: CJA Adult Felony. IT IS ORDERED that David Matthew Miller is appointed to represent Jordy Scott Deboer (1) in this matter. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
21 21 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1) held on 4/3/2023. Related [+] (MO, Courtroom Deputy) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/S-740. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
22 22 APPOINTMENT ORDER. Type of Appointment: CJA - Adult - Felony - Substitution for Federal Defender. IT IS ORDERED that Bryan P Whitaker is appointed to represent Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2) in this matter. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (Gardner, Darrel) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT AND GRANTING10 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR DETENTION as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). Status Hearing set for 4/5/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 740. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (LTR, Case Administrator) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
24 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS - CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (LTR, Case Administrator) [2:23-mj-00144-JAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
Arrest of Jordy Scott Deboer (1) on 4/4/2023. (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2) on 4/4/2023. (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
28 28 INDICTMENT as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1) - Counts 1, 2, 3, and 4 and Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2) - Counts 1, 2, 3, and 4. (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
30 30 Charges and Penalties - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
32 32 Charges and Penalties - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2) (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
37 37 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/31/2023 as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
39 39 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/4/2023 as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
41 41 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/4/2023 as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
26 26 NOTICE of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document - as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). As Indictment has been filed, status hearing is stricken and Arraignment on Indictment set for 4/5/2023 at 2:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 740 before Magistrate Judge Alexander C. Ekstrom. (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document - as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). As Indictment has been filed, preliminary hearing is stricken and Arraignment on Indictment set for 4/5/2023 at 2:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 740 before Magistrate Judge Alexander C. Ekstrom. (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
34 34 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (Baunsgard, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
35 35 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (Baunsgard, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
38 38 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom: Arraignment on Indictment/ Detention Hearing held on 4/5/2023 as to Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). Not Guilty plea entered as to Counts 1,2,3,4. Related [+] (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/S-740. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
40 40 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom: Arraignment on Indictment held on 4/5/2023 as to Jordy Scott Deboer (1). Not Guilty plea entered as to Counts 1,2,3,4. Related [+] (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/S-740. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
42 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS - INDICTMENT by Jordy Scott Deboer (1). (AY, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
43 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS - INDICTMENT by Matthew Gus Joseph Sailors (2). (AY, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]