California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:23-cv-02650
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2023
Terminated:Jul 20, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 21STCV45251
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:24 AM PDT
Defendant
FCA US LLC
Represented By
Spencer Peter Hugret
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Trina M. Clayton
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Wendy Halliday Liles
Represented By
Tionna Grace Dolin
Strategic Legal Practices Apc
contact info
Elizabeth A LaRocque
Strategic Legal Practices Apc
contact info
Tionna Dolin
Strategic Legal Practices Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Auto Company XXIII Inc.
Terminated: 04/07/2023
Represented By
Spencer Peter Hugret
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Trina M. Clayton
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 23, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/26 3:25 PM
ORDER TO PAY FEES31 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court hereby enters an ORDER for FCA US LLC to pay Plaintiff $53,000.00 to resolve attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Payment is to be made to counsel for Plaintiff by 11/13/2024. After satisfaction of payment, Plaintiff will dismiss this case with prejudice within 10 business days against all parties. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
31 31 2 pgs stip Order Thu 08/22 1:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs Fees, Costs and Expenses and Request for Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles.(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/07 3:10 PM
DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Joint Stipulation to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction29 . NO SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
29 29 stip Continue Mon 08/05 10:32 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles.(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, July 20, 2024
28 28 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 07/22 11:51 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Plaintiff WENDY HALLIDAY LILES accepted FCA US LLC's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68 10/4/202317 . Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $203,443.56, pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
27 27 notice Offer of Judgment Fri 07/12 7:11 PM
NOTICE of Offer of Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a)(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
26 26 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/26 1:51 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
25 25 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Thu 06/22 1:53 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 5, 2024. Counsel are directed to contact the private mediator of their choice to arrange a date and time for the mediation. (lom)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 06/22 12:58 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 06/21 12:58 PM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for June 23, 2023. The Court will issue a separate Scheduling Order pursuant to the parties Joint 26(f) Report. No appearances are necessary. The REQUEST for Leave of Trina M. Clayton to Appear for Remote18 and REQUEST to of plaintiff to appear for zoom21 are hereby moot.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
24 24 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 06/22 1:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc.17.) On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing June 23, 2023 is VACATED and the following schedule is set. The following deadlines are set: Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: August 11, 2023; Fact Discovery Cutoff: May 3, 2024; Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): May 17, 2024; Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: May 17, 2024; Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: June 14, 2024; Expert Discovery Cutoff: July 12, 2024; Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: July 5, 2024; Last Day to File Daubert Motions: July 19, 2024; Last Day to File Motions in Limine: December 6, 2024; Final Pretrial Conference (10:30 a.m.): January 9, 2025; Preliminary Trial Estimate:1 5-7 Days. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
21 21 motion Leave Fri 06/16 6:25 PM
REQUEST to of plaintiff to appear for zoom filed by plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 misc Errata Fri 06/16 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. correcting Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan17 (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 06/16 5:52 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Fri 06/16 2:01 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Trina M. Clayton to Appear for Remote filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Request set for hearing on 6/23/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso Request for Remote Appearance,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 09, 2023
17 17 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 06/09 12:09 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles..(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 06/09 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Wendy Halliday Liles(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/05 5:55 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference and Ordering Counsel to Submit Revised Exhibit A by Judge Josephine L. Staton: No later than 6/16/2023, counsel shall file an Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report with a fully completed Exhibit A containing a specific date for each deadline. The CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 6/23/2023 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 06/02 3:12 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/17 7:07 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 04/17 7:05 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
11 11 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 04/14 3:58 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02650-JLS-MARx. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
10 10 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 04/11 4:20 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge(Vilchez, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 10, 2023
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/10 4:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/10 4:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/10 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
6 6 notice Appearance Fri 04/07 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 notice Appearance Fri 04/07 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Appearance Fri 04/07 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/07 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; Stellantis Ventures B.V. (formerly known as FCA Holdco B.V.); Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.).(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/07 2:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/07 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV45251 Receipt No: ACACDC-35102207 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit A to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 8 Exhibit G to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 9 Exhibit H to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 10 Exhibit I to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 11 Exhibit J to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 12 Exhibit K to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 13 Exhibit L to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 14 Exhibit M to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 15 Exhibit N to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 16 Exhibit O to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 17 Exhibit P to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 19 Exhibit R to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 20 Exhibit S to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 21 Exhibit T to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 22 Exhibit U to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 23 Exhibit V to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 24 Exhibit W to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 25 Exhibit X to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 26 Exhibit Y to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 27 Exhibit Z to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 28 Exhibit AA to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 29 Exhibit BB to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 30 Exhibit CC to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 31 Exhibit DD to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 32 Exhibit EE to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 33 Exhibit FF to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 34 Exhibit GG to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 35 Exhibit HH to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 36 Exhibit II to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 37 Exhibit JJ to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 38 Exhibit KK to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 39 Exhibit LL to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 40 Exhibit MM to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 41 Exhibit NN to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 42 Exhibit OO to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 43 Exhibit PP to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 44 Exhibit QQ to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 45 Exhibit RR to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 46 Exhibit SS to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 47 Exhibit TT to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 48 Exhibit UU to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 49 Exhibit VV to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 50 Exhibit WW to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 51 Exhibit XX to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 52 Exhibit YY to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 53 Exhibit ZZ to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 54 Exhibit AAA to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 55 Exhibit BBB to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 56 Exhibit CCC to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 57 Exhibit DDD to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 58 Exhibit EEE to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 59 Exhibit FFF to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 60 Exhibit GGG to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 61 Exhibit HHH to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 62 Exhibit III to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 63 Exhibit JJJ to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 64 Certificate of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/10 3:56 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Auto Company XXIII Inc., Does, FCA US LLC.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/10/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Mon 04/10 3:58 PM
NON-CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Auto Company XXIII Inc.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/10 4:05 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles, upon Defendant AutoNation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Valencia. served on 12/22/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 12/29/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 12 EXHIBIT K TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/10 4:07 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wendy Halliday Liles, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 12/22/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/29/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 11 EXHIBIT J TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/10 4:10 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Auto Company XXIII Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 01/21/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 16 EXHIBIT O TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/10 4:13 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.[FILED IN STATE COURT 01/21/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 15 EXHIBIT N TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]