New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:23-cv-01995
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2023
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MID-L-001015-23
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 1:43 PM EDT
Defendant
ABC CORP. (1-10)
Defendant
GEODIS OVERSEAS, INC.
Defendant
GEODIS USA, LLC
Represented By
IVY WAISBORD
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
BRIAN CASAL
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
DENIZ UZEL REILLY
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
GEODIS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
IVY WAISBORD
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
BRIAN CASAL
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
DENIZ UZEL REILLY
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC.
Represented By
IVY WAISBORD
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
BRIAN CASAL
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
DENIZ UZEL REILLY
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCO CHINCHILLA
Represented By
MICHAEL C. DAWSON
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/5/2024. (kht)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/21 3:56 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (Per ECF No.17 Order) (jab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Remand Tue 03/05 4:24 PM
ORDER that Chinchilla's11 Motion to Remand is DENIED. The Geodis Defendant's5 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Chinchilla may file an Amended Complaint within thirty days from the entry of this Order. If Chinchilla does not file an Amended Complaint by the time prescribed herein, the Complaint may be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/5/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
16 16 19 pgs order Opinion Tue 03/05 4:05 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/5/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
15 15 22 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 10/02 6:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by GEODIS AMERICA, INC., GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC., GEODIS USA, LLC re11 First MOTION to Remand (WAISBORD, IVY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 15, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/15 4:01 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request for adjournment of11 motion to remand; The motion will be reset for 10/16/2023. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/15/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/15 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by IVY WAISBORD on behalf of GEODIS AMERICA, INC., GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC., GEODIS USA, LLC (WAISBORD, IVY)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Fri 09/15 1:27 PM
Letter from Brian Casal. (CASAL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/15 4:02 PM
Reset Deadlines as to11 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/01 8:58 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
11 11 motion Remand Thu 08/31 10:24 PM
First MOTION to Remand by MARCO CHINCHILLA.(DAWSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/16 12:03 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause by e-filed submission addressing the issue of diversity jurisdiction by 8/23/2023. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2023. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/16/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
9 9 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Fri 07/14 1:27 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GEODIS AMERICA, INC., GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC., GEODIS USA, LLC re5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (CASAL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
8 8 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/07 2:44 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MARCO CHINCHILLA re5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (DAWSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, June 26, 2023
7 7 order Order Mon 06/26 3:48 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of the docket. Defendants Geodis America, Inc., Geodis USA, LLC, and Geodis Logistics, LLC (collectively "Defendants") moved to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint on April 14, 2023. (ECF No.5 .) Plaintiff has yet to file any opposition. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by July 7, 2023; otherwise, the Court will consider the Motion to Dismiss unopposed. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/26/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Fri 05/05 4:45 PM
Letter from Deniz Uzel Reilly, Esquire.(REILLY, DENIZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Supplemental Correspondence Letter,
Att: 2 Supplement Defendant's Joint Certification Form
Monday, April 17, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/17 8:47 AM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE . Motion set for 5/15/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
5 5 motion Dismiss Fri 04/14 3:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE by GEODIS AMERICA, INC., GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC., GEODIS USA, LLC.(CASAL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 10, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/10 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN CASAL on behalf of GEODIS AMERICA, INC., GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC., GEODIS USA, LLC (CASAL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Mon 04/10 2:34 PM
Exhibit to1 Notice of Removal, by GEODIS AMERICA, INC., GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC., GEODIS USA, LLC. (CASAL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Mon 04/10 8:55 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Updating Account Mon 04/10 9:30 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal1 submitted by Michael Dawson on 4/7/2023 ppears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (kht)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Diversity Statement Mon 04/10 9:32 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 04/07 5:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEODIS AMERICA, INC, GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC, GEODIS USA, LLC. (REILLY, DENIZ)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/07 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC, GEODIS USA, LLC, GEODIS AMERICA, INC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY - MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-001015-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14231874), filed by GEODIS LOGISTICS, LLC, GEODIS USA, LLC, GEODIS AMERICA, INC.(REILLY, DENIZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 50 pgs EXHIBIT A-F,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/10 9:17 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht)
Related: [-]