California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:23-cv-00623
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2023
Terminated:Jul 13, 2023
Case in other court:San Bernardino County Superior Court, CIV SB 2300530
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:28 AM PDT
Defendant
National Distribution Centers, LLC
Represented By
Allison S Wallin
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alvin Arceo
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Sidney R. Brown
Represented By
Allison S Wallin
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alvin Arceo
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Alvaro Mendoza
Represented By
Allison S Wallin
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Enrique Rocco
Represented By
Jean H Power
Davtyan Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Anita Lodi
Bibiyan Law Group P.C.
contact info
Matthew Jared Carraher
Bibiyan Law Group, PC
contact info
David D Bibiyan
Bibiyan Law Group Apc
contact info
Jeffrey D Klein
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 25, 2024
39 39 misc Receipt Fri 03/29 3:34 PM
Receipt of REMAND LETTER (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
38 38 order Reconsideration Sun 09/03 10:40 PM
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CASE REMANDED TO STATE COURT [DKT. 34] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. For the above reasons, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 7-3's meet-and-confer requirements and for lack of jurisdiction. (lom)
Related: [-]
37 37 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/30 11:40 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion for Reconsideration [Dkt. 34] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on September 1, 2023. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
36 36 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 08/18 5:08 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration,, Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,32 34 Related [+] filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, Alvaro Mendoza, National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-] ply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Remand
Friday, August 11, 2023
35 35 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/11 2:26 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration,, Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,32 34 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco. (Carraher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
34 34 motion Reconsideration Tue 07/25 12:28 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration,, Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,32 filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, Alvaro Mendoza, National Distribution Centers, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/1/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Allison S. Wallin Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Case Remanded to State Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - (Order) to Declaration of Allison S. Wallin,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 13, 2023
33 33 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 07/13 10:31 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino Superior Court. (shb)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Compel Arbitration Remand Case to State Court Thu 07/13 10:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, [DKT. 15], AND DENYING DEFENDANTSMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, [DKT. 13] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court GRANTS the motion to remand. Because this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this case, the Court DENIES the motion to compel arbitration as moot. This case is REMANDED to San Bernardino Superior Court CIV SB 2300530. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (shb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
31 31 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 06/28 7:54 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 9/13/2024. (iva)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 06/28 7:53 AM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2023. Motions due by 8/23/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/13/2024. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2024 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Jury Trial set for 11/25/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
29 29 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/20 4:25 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on June 23, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 06/13 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Alvaro Mendoza.(Attorney Allison S Wallin added to party Alvaro Mendoza(pty:dft))(Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
27 27 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 06/09 4:43 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-15 days, filed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco..(Carraher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Schedule Worksheet
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
26 26 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/07 4:42 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of the Proof of Service [Dkt. 25] as to Defendant Alvaro Mendoza, filed on June 7, 2023, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC [Dkt. 17], issued on May 15, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days Wed 06/07 11:13 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco, upon Defendant Alvaro Mendoza served on 5/26/2023, answer due 7/25/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alvaro Mendoza in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Due diligence declaration attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Carraher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/06 1:05 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: On its own motion, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on the Motion to Compel Arbitration [Dkt.13 ] and Motion to Remand [Dkt.15 ] from June 9, 2023, to July 14, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
23 23 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 05/26 4:10 PM
REPLY Reply in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court15 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco.(Carraher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
Thursday, May 25, 2023
22 22 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 05/25 5:20 PM
REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration13 filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC.(Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sarah Pontoski
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 05/25 2:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jared Carraher counsel for Plaintiff Enrique Rocco. Jean Power is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF ENRIQUE ROCCO. (Carraher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 05/24 5:09 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jared Carraher counsel for Plaintiff Enrique Rocco. Adding Matthew J. Carraher as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Enrique Rocco for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco. (Attorney Matthew Jared Carraher added to party Enrique Rocco(pty:pla))(Carraher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
19 19 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/19 3:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court15 filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC.(Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark Phillips
18 18 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 05/19 1:44 PM
OPPOSITION Motion to Compel Arbitration re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration13 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco. (Power, Jean)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
17 17 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 05/15 4:40 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Declaration [Dkt. 16], that provides the Court an update on the service of process pertaining Defendant Alvaro Mendoza and requests that the OSC be continued. In view of the Declaration, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's request. Plaintiff is directed to file an executed Waiver of Service of Summons, or a Proof of Service of the Summons and Complaint no later than June 14, 2023. If Plaintiff requires additional time, Plaintiff is directed to file an appropriate motion seeking the desired relief. The Court further extends the OSC deadline to June 14, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
16 16 misc Declaration Fri 05/12 11:47 AM
DECLARATION of Jean H. Power re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,,12 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Rocco. (Power, Jean)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
15 15 motion Remand Case to State Court Fri 05/05 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court Enrique Rocco. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Power, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Declaration Decl of Jean H. Power,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
14 14 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 05/05 10:13 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration13 served on May 5, 2023. (Arceo, Alvin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
13 13 motion Compel Arbitration Thu 05/04 9:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of A. Wallin ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Allison Wallin Decl. ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Allison Wallin Decl. ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 5 Declaration of M. Montesano ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Michelle Montesano Decl. ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Michelle Montesano Decl. ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 8 Proposed Order
Friday, April 28, 2023
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause Mon 05/01 8:52 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before May 12, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not been served, for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a proof of service of the summons and complaint.IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/17 4:27 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 04/13 2:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only9 served on April 13, 2023. (Wallin, Allison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/12 2:09 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/10 5:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC, re Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on April 10, 2023. (Arceo, Alvin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/10 1:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/10 1:56 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/10 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/07 7:43 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers, LLC, identifying National Distribution Centers, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., NFI Management Services, LLC, and NFI, L.P.. (Arceo, Alvin)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/07 7:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers, LLC identifying NFI, L.P. as Corporate Parent. (Arceo, Alvin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/07 7:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Sidney R Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Arceo, Alvin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/07 7:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIV SB 2300530 Receipt No: ACACDC-35105403 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Sidney R Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Attorney Alvin Arceo added to party Sidney R Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Alvin Arceo added to party National Distribution Centers, LLC(pty:dft))(Arceo, Alvin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michelle Montesano ISO Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Sarah Pontoski ISO Removal,
Att: 3 Declaration of Alvin Arceo ISO Removal,
Att: 4 42 pgs Exhibit 1 to Alvin Arceo's Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to Alvin Arceo's Declaration
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/10 2:02 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Sidney R. Brown, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Alvaro Mendoza, National Distribution Centers, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Enrique Rocco. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/3/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) Modified on 4/10/2023 (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/10 2:06 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Sidney R. Brown, National Distribution Centers, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/6/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2)(ghap)
Related: [-]