California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00578
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2023 12:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Miguel Angel Gallo (1)
Represented By
Russom Gebreab
Law Office Of Russom Gebreab
contact info
Raj Paul Singh
Williams & Singh, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Steven Lee
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 27 2023
ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing/Trial Setting:Granting 15 Motion to Continue as to Miguel Angel Gallo (1) Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 6/30/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 4/27/2023.(exs)
GPO Jun 28 2023
ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing/Trial Setting:granting 18 Motion to Continue as to Miguel Angel Gallo (1) Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 8/25/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Jinsook Ohta.. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 6/28/2023.(exs)
GPO Jan 03 2024
JUDGMENT as to Miguel Angel Gallo (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for 18 months. Supervised Release for 1 year. Fine waived. Assessment $100 waived.; Count(s) 2, Custody of BOP for 18 months to run concurrent with count 1. Supervised Release for 1 year to run concurrent with count 1. Fine waived. Assessment $100 waived. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta (exs)

Docket last updated: 04/09/2023 12:54 AM PDT
Thursday, March 09, 2023
Arrest of Miguel Angel Gallo (no document attached) (vyc) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Miguel Angel Gallo. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 3/9/2023 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/23/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 4/6/2023 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. (no document attached) (vyc) (vyc). [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/10/2023) info sheet
2 2 2 pgs ORDER as to Miguel Angel Gallo: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 03/10/2023. (vyc) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Miguel Angel Gallo held on 3/10/2023. Appointed Attorney Russom Gebreab, and co-counsel Raj Paul Singh for Miguel Angel Gallo. Bond set as to Miguel Angel Gallo (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 financially responsible adult + 10% cash deposit. Preliminary Hearing set for 03/23/2023 at 02:00pm before Magistrate Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 4/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Written advisement of Due Process Protection Act. Proffer regarding defendant's financial ability to retain an attorney. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(CD# 3/10/2023 LR 23 10:38-10:57). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (vyc) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Miguel Angel Gallo (no document attached) (vyc) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Miguel Angel Gallo (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 financially responsible adult + 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 3/10/2023. (cxl) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Miguel Angel Gallo (Singh, Raj) (ggv). [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing set for 3/23/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. is vacated5 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (tar) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Steven Lee appearing for USA. (Lee, Steven)Attorney Steven Lee added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
9 9 P/S Bond Filed as to Miguel Angel Gallo in amount of $ 20,000, Receipt # 390690. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/21/2023. (Document applicable to USA, Miguel Angel Gallo.) (cxl) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Miguel Angel Gallo re9 Bond. (cxl) [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
11 11 2 pgs NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Lee, Steven) (ggv). [2:23-mj-08136-LR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
12 12 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Miguel Angel Gallo (1) count(s) 1, 2. (vyc)
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment on Information as to Miguel Angel Gallo (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/6/2023. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Defendant consents to proceed via VTC. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 4/28/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Jinsook Ohta. (CD# 4/6/2023 LR 23 10:05-10:26). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (Defendant Attorney Raj Paul Singh). (vyc)
Related: [-]