Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-31871

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:23-ap-03023
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2023
Terminated:Aug 01, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sandor I Metz
5663 Rochester Rd
Dryden, MI 48428
Represented By
Sandor I Metz
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory James LaFleur
126 Aquilla
Eunice, LA 70535
Represented By
Marc Jarrett Sackin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
13 13 order Dismissing Case (text) Tue 08/01 8:54 AM
As a result of the Chapter 13 case having been dismissed on July 17, 2023 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the captioned adversary proceeding is also dismissed. So ordered by /s/ Judge Applebau Related [+] (kcm)
Related: [-] 12 Order Regarding Dismissal and Retention of Residual Jurisdiction
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 08/01 8:54 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:23-ap-3023 : Dismissed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/01 8:55 AM
Adversary Case 4:23-ap-3023 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
12 12 order Regarding Dismissal and Retention of Residual Jurisdiction Mon 07/17 3:18 PM
Order Regarding Dismissal and Retention of Residual Jurisdiction - Motion Due on 7/31/2023. (kcm)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Copy of Mon 07/17 2:59 PM
Copy of: Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Case (Entered In Debtor's Bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
10 10 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Wed 06/28 2:49 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Gregory James LaFleur. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/15 3:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order - Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/20/2024 at 11:00AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
8 8 audio . Wed 06/14 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/14/2023 11:38:36 AM ]. File Size [ 3104 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:28 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Wed 06/14 12:13 PM
Minute Entry. Initial scheduliing conference held. Related [+] (JAM)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Friday, June 09, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/09 10:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/11/2023 (adeld)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Thursday, June 08, 2023
6 6 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Thu 06/08 2:31 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Gregory James LaFleur, Defendant Sandor I Metz. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
5 5 1 pgs court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Tue 05/09 10:45 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 6/14/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (MSK) Note: effective beginning March 16, 2020, Judge Applebaum is conducting all conferences and non evidentiary hearings by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for such a hearing, counsel and parties should call (888) 363-4735 and use Access Code 9318138. Counsel and parties should place their phone on mute and wait until their case is called before unmuting their phone and participating. (This procedure does not apply to Chapter 13 status conferences with the Chapter 13 Trustee. See any applicable notices by the Chapter 13 Trustee for information about status conferences.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
4 4 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/08 3:32 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Sandor I Metz. (Kwiatkowski, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/14 3:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sandor I Metz 4/14/2023 (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 04/07 5:21 PM
Summons Issued on Sandor I Metz Answer Due 05/8/2023 (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/07 5:21 PM
Adversary case 23-03023 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): Complaint by Gregory James LaFleur against Sandor I Metz. Fee Amount $350. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit 1. State Court Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Proof of Service
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit 3. Default
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4. State Court Default Judgment