New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:23-cv-02678
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2023
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
County of Nassau
Represented By
Victoria LaGreca
Office Of The Nassau County Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Nassau County Police Officer John Does #1-10
Defendant
Nassau County Police Officer McCartney
Represented By
Victoria LaGreca
Office Of The Nassau County Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Nassau County Police Department
Represented By
Victoria LaGreca
Office Of The Nassau County Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Nassau County Police Officer Olson
Represented By
Victoria LaGreca
Office Of The Nassau County Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Cary Zimbler
Represented By
Spencer David Shapiro
The Russell Friedman Law Group, LLP
contact info
Pablo A. Fernandez
The Russell Friedman Law Group, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/27 4:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Officer McCartney, Nassau County Police Department, Nassau County Police Officer Olson (LaGreca, Victoria)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/27 4:50 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
26 26 misc Status Report Thu 02/27 3:06 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Lois M. Rosenblatt, Cary Zimbler (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 01/27 6:15 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report in Response to December 27, 2024 Order by Lois M. Rosenblatt (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Mon 01/27 7:42 PM
Electronic STATUS REPORT ORDER: The deadline for the parties to submit a stipulation of dismissal for the District Judge's review or a further status report regarding settlement is extended to 2/27/25. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/27/2025. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 12/27 8:07 AM
STATUS REPORT by Lois M. Rosenblatt (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 12/27 9:19 AM
Electronic STATUS REPORT ORDER re24 Status Report filed by Lois M. Rosenblatt. The deadline for the parties to submit a stipulation of dismissal for the District Judge's review or a further status report regarding settlement is extended to 1/27/25. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/27/2024. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 11/27 10:51 AM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Lois M. Rosenblatt. (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 11/27 11:17 AM
Electronic ORDER granting23 Motion to Adjourn Conference. In light of the parties' representation that this matter has settled, the 12/4/24 status conference is canceled. By 12/27/24, the parties must submit either a stipulation of dismissal for the District Judge's review or a status report updating the Court on the status of settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/27/2024. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
22 22 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/23 10:11 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke: Status Conference held on 9/23/2024. Discovery is ongoing. The body camera footage production issue will be resolved by October 28, 2024. Depositions will be completed by November 22, 2024. Next status conference: December 4, 2024 at 10:15am. At the next conference the parties will be prepared to address summary judgment and/or a pretrial order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/23/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 09/03 9:17 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. On consent and based on the representations in DE20 , Spencer D. Shapiro of Horn Wright LLP is substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff Lois M. Rosenblatt, Public Administrator of Queens County, as administrator for the estate of Cary Zimbler. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/3/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 08/30 10:36 AM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint, by County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Officer McCartney, Nassau County Police Department, Nassau County Police Officer Olson. (LaGreca, Victoria)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 08/30 10:21 AM
Letter MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Lois M. Rosenblatt. (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Change Attorney
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/06 3:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Officer John Does #1-10, Nassau County Police Officer McCartney, Nassau County Police Department, Nassau County Police Officer Olson, filed by Lois M. Rosenblatt. (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Mon 08/05 12:43 PM
Electronic ORDER granting DE18 Motion to Substitute Party. On consent and based on the representations in DE18 , Lois M. Rosenblatt, Public Administrator of Queens County, as Administrator of the Estate of Carey Zimbler, is substituted as Plaintiff in this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a). Plaintiff is directed to promptly file the Amended Complaint on the docket as a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/5/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 08/05 12:45 PM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: The pretrial conference previously scheduled for 9/23/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse is converted to a status conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/5/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
18 18 motion Substitute Party Fri 08/02 3:24 PM
Letter MOTION to Substitute Party on Consent by Cary Zimbler. (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/05 12:54 PM
Electronic ORDER granting DE17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On consent and based on the representations in DE17 , the deadline for Plaintiff to file his motion to substitute Plaintiff's estate is extended, nunc pro tunc , to and including 8/3/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/5/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 06/04 6:38 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Status Report by Cary Zimbler. (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
16 16 minutes Status Conference Wed 03/06 10:25 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 3/6/2024. Plaintiffs counsel advised that Plaintiff recently passed away and the Queens County Public Administrator is handling the estate at this point. Plaintiffs counsel is referred to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25 for how to proceed. The parties will file a joint status report on June 6, 2024 to advise the Court on the progress in the New York State Surrogates Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/6/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/02 1:52 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle. Judge Joan M. Azrack no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/18 11:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set. Next Status Conference set for 3/6/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/18/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Mon 12/18 11:20 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/18/2023. A scheduling order has been entered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/18/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
13 13 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 2:45 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order on consent by Cary Zimbler (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/09 11:12 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 12/18/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/9/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/03 1:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Officer McCartney, Nassau County Police Department, Nassau County Police Officer Olson. (LaGreca, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/27 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer David Shapiro on behalf of Cary Zimbler (aty to be noticed) (Shapiro, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 22, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/22 6:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cary Zimbler. Nassau County Police Officer John Does #1-10 served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Fernandez, Pablo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/22 6:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cary Zimbler. Nassau County Police Officer Olson served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Fernandez, Pablo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/22 6:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cary Zimbler. Nassau County Police Officer McCartney served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Fernandez, Pablo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/22 6:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cary Zimbler. Nassau County Police Department served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Fernandez, Pablo)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/22 6:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cary Zimbler. County of Nassau served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Fernandez, Pablo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/11 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 04/11 10:34 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/11 10:29 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/11 10:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/10 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Officer John Does #1-10, Nassau County Police Officer McCartney, Nassau County Police Department, Nassau County Police Officer Olson filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16585412 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Cary Zimbler. (Fernandez, Pablo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons with Rider