NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. v. RAIMONDO et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00982 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 16:1801 Fishery Conservation and Management Act (FCMA) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 10:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
JANET COIT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GINA M. RAIMONDO
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION
1001 N Fairfax St Suite 501
Alexandria, VA 22314 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/26 3:43 PM
NOTICE (Notice of Filing Final Rule Regarding 2024 Recreational Measures) by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO(Brown, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Final Rule Regarding 2024 Recreational Measures | ||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Joint Appendix
Fri 03/01 8:49 PM
JOINT APPENDIX by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Volume 1, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Volume 2 | ||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 02/16 3:10 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO. (Brown, Mark) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 02/16 2:42 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION. (Richardson, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 01/24 9:42 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. (Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
31 | 31
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 01/24 9:35 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re30 Motion for Summary Judgment,27 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. (Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 12/20 7:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO.(Brown, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response to motion
Wed 12/20 7:33 PM
RESPONSE re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO. (Brown, Mark) |
|
28 | 28
22
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 12/20 3:20 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re25 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION. (Richardson, Jeffrey) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 12/20 3:18 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION.(Richardson, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 12/08 8:20 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Defendants And Intervenor Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment, Combined With Any Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/20/2023. Plaintiff Combined Opposition And Reply Memorandum due by 1/24/2024. Federal Defendants And Intervenor Reply Memoranda due by 2/16/2024. (mac) |
||
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Thu 12/07 6:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties'26 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend the Briefing Schedule, and MODIFYING the SCHEDULING ORDER issued on August 22, 2023, as follows: ???1. By December 20, 2023, federal defendants and intervenor shall file any cross-motions for summary judgment, combined with any opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; ???2. By January 24, 2024, plaintiff shall file any combined opposition and reply memorandum; and ???3. By February 16, 2024, federal defendants and intervenor shall file any reply memoranda. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 7, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 12/06 6:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 11/15 9:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Carl Safina, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Charles Witek, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Gina Trujillo, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 09/29 8:08 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record - Supplement) by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO.(Brown, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Certified Index | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/29 8:03 AM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO.(Brown, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/30 10:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION, JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(zed) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 08/29 5:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's21 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to docket the plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ECF No. 21-2. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 29, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 08/28 10:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Final Supplemented Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Final Supplemented Complaint with Track Changes | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/23 8:36 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Motion To Amend The1 Complaint due by 8/28/2023. Federal Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To Amended Complaint due by 9/29/2023. Plaintiff Motion To Complete Or Supplement The Administrative Record due by 10/25/2023 Plaintiff Motion For Summary Judgment due by 11/15/2023. Federal Defendants And Intervenor Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment, Combined With Any Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/13/2023. Plaintiff Combined Opposition And Reply Memorandum due by 1/10/2024. Federal Defendants And Intervenor Reply due by 2/7/2024. (mac) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 08/22 10:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties'20 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) By August 28, 2023, plaintiff will file any motion to amend the1 Complaint; (2) By September 29, 2023, federal defendants will file any answer or otherwise respond to any amended complaint, and produce the administrative record for the 2023 Recreational Management Measures; (3) By October 25, 2023, plaintiff will file any motion to complete or supplement the administrative record; (4) If plaintiff's motion to supplement the administrative record is unopposed and if no such motion is filed-- a. By November 15, 2023, plaintiff shall file any motion for summary judgment; b. By December 13, 2023, federal defendants and intervenor shall file any cross-motions for summary judgment, combined with any opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; c. By January 10, 2024, plaintiff shall file any combined opposition and reply memorandum; and d. By February 7, 2024, federal defendants and intervenor shall file any reply memoranda; (5) If plaintiff seeks to complete or supplement the administrative record, the foregoing summary judgment briefing deadlines shall not apply and the parties shall file a joint status report proposing an amended schedule to govern further proceedings within 7 days of the Court's resolution of the record dispute. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 22, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/18 5:41 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/28 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Richardson on behalf of AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION (Richardson, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Thu 07/27 5:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING proposed intervenor American Sportfishing Association's15 Unopposed Motion to Intervene as a Defendant. "On timely motion, the court must permit anyone to intervene who...claims an interest relating to the property or transaction that is the subject of the action, and is so situated that disposing of the action may as a practical matter impair or impede the movant's ability to protect its interest, unless existing parties adequately represent that interest." Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2). A party's right to intervene under this rule depends on four factors: "(1) the timeliness of the motion; (2) whether the applicant claims an interest relating to the property or transaction which is the subject of the action; (3) whether the applicant is so situated that the disposition of the action may as a practical matter impair or impede the applicant's ability to protect that interest; and (4) whether the applicant's interest is adequately represented by existing parties." Fund for Animals, Inc. v. Norton , 322 F.3d 728, 731 (D.C. Cir. 2003) (cleaned up). Here, all four factors favor the intervention of the American Sportfishing Association ("ASA"). First, on timeliness, the federal defendants have only recently filed their answer in late June, and a schedule to govern further proceedings will not be set until late August, as the parties wait for final action to be taken on the 2023 Recreational Management Measures proposed rule. See Minute Order (July 11, 2023). ASA's intervention will thus have no disruptive effect, as it has intervened in time to follow any briefing schedule that will later be imposed. Second and third, ASA has a cognizable interest that may be impaired because it represents recreational anglers who have a direct interest in their ability to fish for summer flounder, scup, and black sea bass, which they enjoy under the fishery management plan challenged here. Fourth and finally, ASA's interests are not adequately represented by any existing party. Plaintiff challenges the management plan, which ASA wishes to stand. The federal defendants may seek to uphold the plan, but they are not a fully suitable stand-in for the ASA because non-governmental entities, like ASA, have a "more narrow" interest, whereas the Government represents a broader public interest, even if there is "general agreement" between them. Fund for Animals , 322 F.3d at 737 (cleaned up); see also Natural Res. Def. Council v. Costle , 561 F.2d 904, 912 (D.C. Cir. 1977). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that ASA's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that ASA's motion, incorporated memorandum, and supporting affidavit, which together make clear ASA's position in this case, satisfy the requirements of Rule 24(c). See, e.g. , Mandan, Hidatsa & Arikara Nation v. U.S. Dep't of the Interior , No. 20-cv-1918 (ABJ), 2020 WL 12655958, at *3 (D.D.C. Aug. 27, 2020). It is further ORDERED that ASA will follow all deadlines set for the federal defendants in any scheduling orders, and endeavor in good faith to avoid duplicative briefing of arguments covered in the federal defendants' briefs. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 27, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/27 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant American Sportfishing Association's16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Jeffrey Edward Richardson may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendant in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 27, 2023. (lcap) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to motion
Fri 07/14 7:32 PM
RESPONSE re15 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by American Sportfishing Association filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 07/11 4:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'17 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings by the sooner of (1) 14 days after National Marine Fisheries Service takes final action with respect to the 2023 Recreational Management Measures proposed rule, or (2) August 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 11, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/07 11:03 PM
First STATUS REPORT by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/30 3:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Edward Richardson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10176629. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION.(Cumby, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Edwards Richardson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
15 | 15
motion
Intervene
Fri 06/30 3:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by AMERICAN SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION.(Cumby, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Glenn Hughes In Support of American Sportfishing Associations Motion to Intervene as a Defendant) | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 06/23 8:57 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Notice of Filing Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record) by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO.(Brown, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record) | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/23 8:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO.(Brown, Mark) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Masterton on behalf of NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. (Masterton, Molly) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Mon 06/05 11:10 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JANET COIT served on 4/15/2023; NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE served on 4/15/2023; NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 4/17/2023; GINA M. RAIMONDO served on 4/17/2023. (See Docket Entry10 to view document). (zed) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Mon 05/22 6:10 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. served on 4/18/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/18/2023.(Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/22 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Elizabeth Leefatt on behalf of NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. (Leefatt, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 05/22 10:13 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer due by 6/23/2023. (hmc) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/19 4:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants'8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING defendants to file their answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's1 Complaint by June 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 19, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 05/18 5:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO.(Brown, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 04/13 4:08 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zed) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Wed 04/12 3:36 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected request for summons to issue by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. re1 Complaint, filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Desormeau, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Request for summons to issue, | ||
Att: 2 Request for summons to issue, | ||
Att: 3 Request for summons to issue, | ||
Att: 4 Request for summons to issue, | ||
Att: 5 Request for summons to issue | ||
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Wed 04/12 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to kdesormeau@nrdc.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms (16 USC 1855(3)(A) ) (cb, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Standing Order
Tue 04/11 6:01 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 11, 2023. (lcbah1) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 04/11 11:18 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, GINA M. RAIMONDO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/11 11:09 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/11 5:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's3 Motion for Molly Masterton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Ms. Masterton may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 11, 2023. (lcbah1) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/10 7:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Molly Masterton, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9989001. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Desormeau, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 04/10 7:02 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. (Desormeau, Katherine) |
|
1 | 1
28
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/10 6:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9988985) filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC..(Desormeau, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons |