Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:23-cv-00246
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 25, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 12:49 PM CDT
Defendant
Jim Craig
Represented By
Orlando R. Richmond, Sr.
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Gerald L. Kucia
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Charles F. Morrow
Butler Snow Llp-Memphis
contact info
Gerald L. Kucia-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Edderek Linnel Cole
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Margaret Z. Smith
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Meade W. Mitchell
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-40
Defendant
Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr.
Represented By
Clarence Webster, III
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Robert Miller
Represented By
Clarence Webster, III
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Mississippi State Department of Health
Represented By
Orlando R. Richmond, Sr.
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Gerald L. Kucia
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Charles F. Morrow
Butler Snow Llp-Memphis
contact info
Gerald L. Kucia-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Edderek Linnel Cole
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Margaret Z. Smith
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Meade W. Mitchell
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Defendant
Kishia Powell
Represented By
Clarence Webster, III
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Jerriot Smash
Represented By
Clarence Webster, III
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
The City of Jackson, Mississippi
Represented By
Claire Barker-City Gov
City Of Jackson
contact info
Clarence Webster, III
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Drew McLemore Martin
Drew Martin, Attorney, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Trilogy Engineering Services LLC
Defendant
Tony Yarber
Represented By
Clarence Webster, III
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
J.W.
Represented By
Darryl M. Gibbs
Chhabra & Gibbs, PA
contact info
John P. Guinan - PHV
Levy Konigsberg, LLP
contact info
Rogen K. Chhabra
Chhabra & Gibbs, PA
contact info
Melanie P. Daly - PHV
Levy Konigsberg, LLP
contact info
Corey M. Stern - PHV
Levy Konigsberg, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheridan A. Carr-City Gov on behalf of The City of Jackson, Mississippi (Carr-City Gov, Sheridan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/29 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Drew McLemore Martin on behalf of The City of Jackson, Mississippi (Martin, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/19 5:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J.W. (Stern - PHV, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/07 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr served on 6/5/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Daly - PHV, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
27 27 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 06/05 4:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Mitchell, Meade)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss Mon 06/05 4:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health(Mitchell, Meade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Williams I,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law Supporting State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed in Williams I,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Reply Brief Supporting State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Williams I
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/05 8:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Trilogy Engineering Services LLC served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Daly - PHV, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/02 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Kishia Powell served on 5/9/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Daly - PHV, Melanie)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/02 7:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Jim Craig served on 5/10/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Daly - PHV, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/25 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Robert Miller served on 5/18/2023, answer due 6/8/2023. (Daly - PHV, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/23 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Kucia on behalf of Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Kucia, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/22 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Morrow on behalf of Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Morrow, Charles)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/22 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Cole, Edderek)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/22 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Orlando R. Richmond, Sr on behalf of Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Richmond, Orlando)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/18 3:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr, Robert Miller, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, The City of Jackson, Mississippi, Tony Yarber.(Webster, Clarence)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/18 10:55 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Mississippi State Department of Health and Jim Craig shall have until June 5, 2023, to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/18/23 (NL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/17 10:54 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Smith, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/15 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meade W. Mitchell on behalf of Jim Craig, Mississippi State Department of Health (Mitchell, Meade)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/15 7:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Tony Yarber served on 5/9/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Stern - PHV, Corey)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/15 7:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Mississippi State Department of Health served on 5/9/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Stern - PHV, Corey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/11 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Trilogy Engineering Services LLC served on 5/9/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Stern - PHV, Corey)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/11 8:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. Jerriot Smash served on 5/9/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Stern - PHV, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/09 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Barker-City Gov on behalf of The City of Jackson, Mississippi (Barker-City Gov, Claire)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 05/09 3:16 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 : Wrong case number on pleading. Attorney is directed to correct the error in future filings. (LAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 05/04 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr., Jim Craig, Robert Miller, Mississippi State Department of Health, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, Trilogy Engineering Services LLC, Tony Yarber. (CO)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/17 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.W.. The City of Jackson, Mississippi served on 4/12/2023, answer due 5/3/2023. (Stern - PHV, Corey)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 04/17 10:08 AM
***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on City of Jackson, MS c/o Angela Harris on April 12, 2023, filed by J.W.. (Stern - PHV, Corey) Modified on 4/17/2023 (LAT)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/17 10:48 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Summons Returned Executed. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event. (LAT) Modified on 4/17/2023 (LAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/13 2:52 PM
MOTION for John Guinan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5092965) by J.W.(Gibbs, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/13 2:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys Corey M. Stern and Melanie Daly be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/13/23 (NL)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/13 3:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney John Guinan be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/13/23 (NL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/12 4:44 PM
MOTION for Melanie Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5092047) by J.W.(Gibbs, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/12 4:41 PM
MOTION for Corey M. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5092036) by J.W.(Gibbs, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, April 10, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/10 5:33 PM
Summons Issued as to The City of Jackson, Mississippi. (CO)
Related: [-]
1 1 93 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/10 5:29 PM
COMPLAINT against The City of Jackson, Mississippi; Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr.; Tony Yarber; Kishia Powell; Robert Miller; Jerriot Smash; Mississippi State Department of Health; Jim Craig; Trilogy Engineering Services LLC; John Does 1-40; ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5089079); filed by J.W.(CO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2) - EPA Emergency Administrative Order 3-27-21
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - (Part 2 of 2) EPA Emergency Administrative Order 3-27-21
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Jackson Press Release,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Daugherty Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Grevatt Letter 2-29-16,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - City of Jackson LCR Compliance Plan 022016,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Consumer Notice Regarding Your Drinking Water 5-12-21,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Kemker Letter,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet