Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-10661

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:23-ap-01096
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2023
Terminated:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Douglas Heck
1417 Central Ave
Matawan, NJ 07747
Represented By
Douglas Heck
contact info
Plaintiff
FARMPLAST LLC
GAROFALO O0'NEILL RUGGIERIO 60 Baldwin Road Suite 202
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
William S. Ruggierio
Garofalo O'Neill Ruggierio LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, November 09, 2023
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 11/09 4:13 PM
Adversary Case (3:23-ap-1096) Closed. (dmi)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation Fri 10/06 3:34 PM
Stipulation Between Douglas Heck and Farmplast, LLC, re:Stipulation of Settlement filed by David E. Shaver on behalf of Douglas Heck. (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
court Hearing Held Fri 06/16 10:53 AM
Minute of 6/16/23; OUTCOME: Joint Scheduling Order Submitted Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 06/15 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 06/15 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
7 7 order Joint Scheduling Order Mon 06/12 11:58 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 6/12/2023. Discovery due by 11/30/2023. Trial date set for 1/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Mediation Order Mon 06/12 11:56 AM
Mediation Order. David G. Beslow (Mediator) added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 6/12/2023. (wiq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
5 5 court Alias Summons Issued Thu 05/11 9:36 AM
Alias Summons Issued to FARMPLAST LLC for service on Douglas Heck Answer due on 6/12/2023 (mjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
4 4 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 05/10 1:56 PM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by William S. Ruggierio on behalf of Farmplast, LLC. (Ruggierio, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Farmplast, LLC
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/03 4:43 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by David E. Shaver on behalf of Douglas Heck. (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 04/12 9:55 AM
Summons Issued to FARMPLAST LLC for Service on Douglas Heck Answer due on 5/12/2023 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/15/2023 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/11 2:17 PM
Adversary case 23-01096 Complaint by FARMPLAST LLC, Douglas Heck against Douglas Heck. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Ruggierio, William)
Related: [-]