Doe #1 v. Lee et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00018 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 3:57 PM CDT |
Defendant
William B. Lee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David B. Rausch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #1
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 03/25 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Rachel A. Newton on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Newton, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thu 05/11 4:41 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/11/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 05/11 4:20 PM
ORDER re12 Joint MOTION to Stay: Motion GRANTED. The initial case management conference scheduled on 7/3/2023 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/11/2023. (af) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stay
Wed 05/10 4:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch.(Jones, Miranda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Stay | ||
11 | 11
18
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 05/10 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #1 . (Nisbet, John) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 05/10 3:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #1. (Nisbet, John) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 05/03 9:28 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Miranda H. Jones admitted to this court . (ad) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 05/02 1:00 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/2/2023. (mg) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 05/01 2:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of7 First MOTION for Protective Order filed by John Doe #1 . (Nisbet, John) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Protective Order
Mon 05/01 2:02 PM
First MOTION for Protective Order by John Doe #1. (Nisbet, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/01 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miranda H. Jones on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Jones, Miranda) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/13 11:23 AM
Summons issued as to William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 04/13 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2023 at 04:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ad) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 04/13 11:03 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 04/13 10:53 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:21-cv-590, 3:21-cv-593, 3:21-cv-594, 3:21-cv-595 and 3:21-cv-596. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 04/13/23. (ad) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 04/13 1:09 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for John B. Nisbet, III admitted to this court . (ad) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/12 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3799692), filed by John Doe #1.(ad) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - 1996 indictment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit - 1997 judgment, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit - motion to require community supervision for life, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit - redacted 2006 amended judgment, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit - order releasing defendant from community supervision for life, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit - letter from TBI denying release from SORA |