New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00197
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Apr 13, 2023 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
FRANK COSTANZA (1)
Represented By
MICHAEL P. KORIBANICS
Koribanics & Koribanics
contact info
JOSEPH R. RUBINO
Joseph R. Rubino Attorney At Law
contact info
CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS
Greenbaum Rowe Smith & Davis
contact info
Notice Only
Carly Schultz
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SAMANTHA CHRISTINE FASANELLO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2023 4:14 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
1 1 3 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to FRANK COSTANZA (1). (tjg, ) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to FRANK COSTANZA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/24/21. (tjg, ) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
Arrest of FRANK COSTANZA. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by FRANK COSTANZA placed on the record. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Initial Appearance & Bail Hearing as to FRANK COSTANZA held on 7/8/2022. (Court Reporter/Recorder: ZOOM) (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING as to FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/8/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 20 as to FRANK COSTANZA: Appointment of Attorney CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS for FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/8/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to FRANK COSTANZA (1) $100,000 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/8/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
11 11 Appearance Bond Entered as to FRANK COSTANZA in amount of $100,000 UNSECURED. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
12 12 BRADY ORDER as to FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/8/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANK COSTANZA Time excluded from 7/21/22 until 9/30/22.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/21/22. (tjg, ) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
14 14 2 pgs PETITION AND ORDER FOR ACTION ON CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE as to FRANK COSTANZA. An in-person Bail Review Hearing shall be scheduled for a Date TBD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/25/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Bail Review Hearing as to FRANK COSTANZA held on 10/11/2022. (Court Reporter/Recorder: ECR) (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/11/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
17 17 PETITION AND ORDER FOR ACTION ON CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE as to FRANK COSTANZA. AN IN PERSON BAIL VIOLATION HEARING IS SET FOR TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 8, 2022 AT 12:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 2B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/3/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Bail Violation & Revocation Hearing as to FRANK COSTANZA held on 11/9/2022. (Court Reporter/Recorder: ECR) (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/9/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
20 20 PETITION AND ORDER FOR ACTION ON CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE as to FRANK COSTANZA. AN IN PERSON BAIL VIOLATION HEARING IS SET FOR THURSDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 2B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/22/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
21 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Christopher Adams. by FRANK COSTANZA. (ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
22 22 CJA 20 as to FRANK COSTANZA: Appointment of Attorney JOSEPH R. RUBINO for FRANK COSTANZA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/30/22. (tjg, ) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
23 23 CJA 20 as to FRANK COSTANZA: Appointment of Attorney MICHAEL P. KORIBANICS for FRANK COSTANZA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/22. (tjg, ) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Bail Revocation Hearing as to FRANK COSTANZA held on 12/20/2022. Ordered Defendant's Bail Revoked. (Court Reporter/Recorder: ECR) (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 12/20/22. (jbb) [2:21-mj-09201-CLW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
26 26 4 pgs INFORMATION as to FRANK COSTANZA (1) count(s) 1. (jl, )
Related: [-]
27 27 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by FRANK COSTANZA. (jl, )
Related: [-]
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi:Plea Agreement Hearing as to FRANK COSTANZA held on 3/14/2023, Plea entered by FRANK COSTANZA (1): Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 7/20/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (Court Reporter: Nicole Sesta (973-963-5950)) (jl, )
Related: [-]
29 29 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to FRANK COSTANZA. (jl, )
Related: [-]
30 30 8 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to FRANK COSTANZA. (jl, )
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing For Felony Pleas and/or Sentencings as to FRANK COSTANZA. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/14/2023. (jl, )
Related: [-]