Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:23-ap-50336
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kenneth A. Berlin
22 Canterbury Lane
Belle Mead, NJ 08502
Represented By
Kenneth A. Berlin
contact info
Defendant
Ron Kalfus
7004 Kennedy Blvd E
Guttenberg, NJ 07093
Represented By
Ron Kalfus
contact info
Defendant
Brian Markison
400 Crossing Blvd
Bridgewater, NJ 08807
Represented By
Brian Markison
contact info
Plaintiff
Don A. Beskrone, not individually, but solely as Chapter 7 trustee for ROSETTA GENOMICS, INC.
500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, April 11, 2024
31 31 misc Notice of Change of Address Thu 04/11 5:40 PM
Notice of Change of Address /Firm Affiliation Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
30 30 notice Completion of Briefing - Notice Tue 09/26 1:51 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, September 14, 2023
29 29 motion Request for Oral Argument Thu 09/14 11:18 AM
Request for Oral Argument Filed by Don A. Beskrone Related [+]. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
28 28 motion Request for Oral Argument Tue 09/12 11:52 AM
Request for Oral Argument Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison Related [+]. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
27 27 22 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Tue 09/12 11:38 AM
Memorandum of Law Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 11, 2023
26 26 30+ pgs misc Memorandum of Law Fri 08/11 2:58 PM
Memorandum of Law //Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Declaration of Barry Lax
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 30, 2023
25 25 misc Declaration Fri 06/30 7:26 PM
Declaration of Aurora Cassirer Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-] 24
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Declaration 2
Att: 3 Declaration 3a
Att: 4 Exhibit 3b
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
Att: 6 Exhibit 5
Att: 7 Exhibit 6a
Att: 8 Exhibit 6b
Att: 9 Exhibit 7a
Att: 10 Exhibit 7b
Att: 11 Exhibit 8
Att: 12 Exhibit 9
Att: 13 Exhibit 10
Att: 14 Exhibit 11
Att: 15 Exhibit 12
Att: 16 Exhibit 13
Att: 17 Exhibit 14
Att: 18 Exhibit 15
Att: 19 Exhibit 16
Att: 20 Exhibit 17
24 24 30+ pgs misc Memorandum of Law Fri 06/30 7:17 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion Fri 06/30 6:37 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 29, 2023
22 22 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 06/29 11:18 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Aurora Cassirer Related [+] Order Signed on 6/29/2023. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 18
21 21 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 06/29 11:17 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Christina H. Bost Seaton Related [+] Order Signed on 6/29/2023. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
20 20 motion Leave - Motion Wed 06/28 2:58 PM
Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit Requirements with Respect to the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 06/28 1:49 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Christina H. Bost Seaton . Receipt Number BDEDC-4168, Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 06/28 1:47 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Aurora Cassirer . Receipt Number BDEDC-4168, Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 06/28 1:31 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Add Attorney Wed 06/28 1:34 PM
Attorney Maura L. Burke and Carl D. Neff for Brian Markison; Kenneth A. Berlin and Ron Kalfus added to case Filed by Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. (Neff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 06/08 9:01 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 6/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/02 2:37 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending Time For Defendants To Answer, Move Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint And Setting Briefing Schedule On Defendants Motion To Dismiss Related [+] Order Signed on 6/2/2023. (CMB)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation
Thursday, June 01, 2023
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 06/01 4:56 PM
Certification of Counsel Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,10 ,11
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
13 13 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 06/01 4:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Don A. Beskrone (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 06/01 3:46 PM
***** WITHDRAWAL SEE DOCKET # 13 ***** Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin) Modified on 6/2/2023 (LH)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,10 ,11
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
11 11 cmp Alias Summons Wed 05/10 2:21 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Plaintiff Don A. Beskrone. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 27, 2023
10 10 cmp Alias Summons Thu 04/27 3:03 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Kenneth A. Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/26 7:34 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Robert R. Miller Related [+] Order Signed on 4/26/2023. (CMB)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/26 7:33 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Robert J. Grand Related [+] Order Signed on 4/26/2023. (CMB)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/26 7:32 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Barry R. Lax Related [+] Order Signed on 4/26/2023. (CMB)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 04/21 11:21 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Robert R. Miller of Lax & Neville LLP . Receipt Number 4118336, Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 04/21 11:19 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Robert J. Grand of Lax & Neville LLP . Receipt Number 4118336, Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 04/21 11:15 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Barry R. Lax of Lax & Neville LLP . Receipt Number 4118336, Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 04/13 8:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-50336 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 04/12 2:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Kenneth Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 04/12 2:24 PM
Adversary case 23-50336 Complaint by Don A. Beskrone, not individually but solely as Chapter 7 Trustee for Rosetta Genomics, Inc. against Kenneth Berlin, Ron Kalfus, Brian Markison. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/11/2023. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]