Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:23-cv-00747
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Alcove Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Bryan E. Meek
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Daniel J. Rudary
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Defendant
Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc.
5314 Maryland Way, Suite 10
Brentwood, TN 37027
Represented By
Bryan E. Meek
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Daniel J. Rudary
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Holmer
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated 2416 Goddard Road
Toledo, OH 43606
Represented By
Bradley A. Sherman
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
F. Allen Boseman, Jr.
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
Ashley M. Fuchs
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Melanie Howell
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated 9 N Cleveland Street
Minster, OH 45865
Represented By
Bradley A. Sherman
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
F. Allen Boseman, Jr.
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
Ashley M. Fuchs
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Conita Oakes
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated 245 Jack Oak Point Road
St. Mary's, OH 45885
Represented By
Bradley A. Sherman
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
F. Allen Boseman, Jr.
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info
Ashley M. Fuchs
Sherman Boseman Legal Group
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order: See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/30/2024. Related Document 7. (S,SR)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
19 19 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 11/06 4:18 PM
Attorney Appearance Notice of Re-Entry of Appearance by Daniel J. Rudary , Esq. and Bryan E. Meek, Esq. filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Rudary, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 3:11 PM
Amended complaint Collective Action against Alcove Ventures, LLC, Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc.. Filed by Conita Oakes, Melanie Howell. (Sherman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 10/22 4:06 PM
Order: [non-document] The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF No.18 ). Because proceedings are stayed pending the completion of arbitration, the parties are not required to take any further action at this time. Once the stay has been lifted, the Court will set a deadline for Defendants to respond, if appropriate. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/22/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
17 17 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Tue 10/15 10:36 AM
Order: The Court grants the16 motion to withdraw. Defendants shall have new counsel enter an appearance in this action on or before November 14, 2024. BMD shall provide notice of this Order and the deadline to secure new counsel to Defendants. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/15/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 10/02 1:35 PM
Motion by Daniel J. Rudary, Bryan E. Meek, and Brennan, Manna & Diamond, LLC to withdraw as attorney filed by Alcove Ventures, LLC, Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc.. (Rudary, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
15 15 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Memorandum Opinion and Order Mon 09/30 3:46 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/30/2024. Related Document7 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
14 14 oth_ans Brief Wed 08/21 12:28 PM
Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Alcove Ventures, LLC d/b/a Pysch360 and Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Melanie Howell, Conita Oakes. Related document(s)13 . (Sherman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Melanie Howell Employment Offer Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Conita Oakes Employment Offer Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Deposit Request
Friday, August 02, 2024
13 13 oth_ans Brief Fri 08/02 9:53 AM
Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)12 . (Rudary, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order Wed 07/17 2:52 PM
Order for supplemental briefing. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 7/17/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order and Notice of Party Dismissal Tue 03/26 9:34 AM
Marginal Order and Stipulation Dismissing Plaintiff Erin Holmer with prejudice. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/26/2024. Related Document10 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Stipulation (atty event) Tue 03/26 8:10 AM
Joint Proposed Stipulation to Dismiss Claims with Prejudice filed by Erin Holmer. (Fuchs, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
9 9 resp Reply Tue 06/13 5:59 PM
Reply in support of7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and Motion to compel arbitration filed by All Defendants. (Rudary, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
8 8 resp Opposition Thu 06/01 3:35 PM
Opposition to7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and Motion to compel arbitration filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sherman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Howell,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Oakes
Thursday, May 04, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 05/04 5:55 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and to compel arbitration filed by Alcove Ventures, LLC, Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc..(Rudary, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Rocco Coniglio,
Att: 2 Coniglio Dec. Exhibit A (Holmer Employment Agreement),
Att: 3 Coniglio Dec. Exhibit B (Howell Employment Agreement),
Att: 4 Coniglio Dec. Exhibit C (Oakes Employment Agreement)
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 05/04 5:52 PM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Rudary and Bryan E. Meek filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Rudary, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Thu 04/20 11:22 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc. c/o Cogency Global,Inc. filed on behalf of Erin Holmer, Conita Oakes, Melanie Howell. Related document(s)2 . (F,ML)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 04/20 11:14 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc. on 4/17/2023, filed on behalf of Erin Holmer; Conita Oakes; Melanie Howell. Related document(s)2 .(F,ML)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Mon 04/17 2:05 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Alcove Ventures, LLC on 4/15/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)2 . (L,Br)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 04/13 3:05 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Alcove Ventures, LLC (additional summons issued for service c/o statutory agent), Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc. (additional summons issued for service c/o statutory agent).. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/13 1:53 PM
Complaint with jury demand Collective Action against Alcove Ventures, LLC, Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11944558.. Filed by Erin Holmer, Conita Oakes, Melanie Howell. (Sherman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Holmer, et al v. Alcove Ventures, LLC, et al,
Att: 2 Summons Alcove Ventures, LLC dba Psych 360,
Att: 3 Summons Rocco Coniglio - Statutory Agent for Alcove Ventures,
Att: 4 Summons Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc.,
Att: 5 Summons Cogency Global - Statutory Agent for Mindcare Solutions
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 04/13 2:54 PM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 04/13 2:55 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 04/13 3:40 PM
Service by Clerk. Summonses and Complaint addressed to Alcove Ventures, LLC (c/o Psych360) Related [+], Alcove Ventures, LLC (c/o Rocco Coniglio), Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc., Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc. (c/o Cogency Global, Inc) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (F,AW)
Related: [-] ceipt # 7018 3090 0000 1098 2800ceipt # 7018 3090 0000 1098 2817ceipt # 7018 3090 0000 1098 2824ceipt # 7018 3090 0000 1098 2831