hollett v. Boyden World Corporation
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:23-cv-03088 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331ag Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 7:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boyden World Corporation
2 Manhattanville Road
Purchase, NY 10577 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gray Hollett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Boyden World Corporation and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Boyden World Corporation. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Shmil, Stefanie) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/02 11:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Stefanie Shmil. RE-FILE Document No. 17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Boyden World Corporation. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Shmil, Stefanie) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Fri 07/21 9:22 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 9/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:14 Letter filed by Boyden World Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has reviewed the parties' attached letter requesting an extension of time to submit the proposed joint case management plan. The parties' request is GRANTED and they are directed to submit a proposed joint case management plan on or before September 14, 2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/10/2023) (ate) |
|
14 | 14
![]() JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Both Parties dated July 10, 2023 Document filed by Boyden World Corporation..(Shmil, Stefanie) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Thu 07/20 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/7/2023.(sge) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER Defendant Boyden World Corporation ("Defendant") has filed an Answer, dated June 22, 2023 (ECF No. 11), to Gray Hollett's ("Plaintiff") Complaint, dated April 18, 2023 (ECF No. 4). Thus, the Court waives the Initial Pre-Trial Conference requirement and directs the parties to submit a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto) by July 24, 2023. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge Krause within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/23/2023) (jca) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/7/2023. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/01/2015) (sge) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to4 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Boyden World Corporation..(Shmil, Stefanie) |
|
10 | 10
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boyden World Corporation..(Shmil, Stefanie) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Celena R Mayo on behalf of Boyden World Corporation..(Mayo, Celena) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stefanie Lynn Shmil on behalf of Boyden World Corporation..(Shmil, Stefanie) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Boyden World Corporation waiver sent on 4/13/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. Document filed by Gray Hollett..(Schneider, Kirsten) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boyden World Corporation. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/19 11:22 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/19 11:22 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/19 11:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boyden World Corporation, re:4 Complaint. Document filed by Gray Hollett..(Schneider, Kirsten) |
|
4 | 4
![]() COMPLAINT against Boyden World Corporation. Document filed by Gray Hollett..(Schneider, Kirsten) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schneider, Kirsten) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/14 12:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Fri 04/14 12:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/19/2023. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/14 12:29 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boyden World Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by gray hollett..(Schneider, Kirsten) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Boyden World Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27603213)Document filed by gray hollett..(Schneider, Kirsten) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |