Consolidated
Lead case: 3:23-md-03071

Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00335
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2023
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Case in other court:Washington Western, 2:22-cv-01740
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:00 PM CDT
Defendant
Equity Residential
Represented By
Curt Roy Hineline
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Alyse F Stach
Baker & Hostetler Llp (philadelphia)
contact info
Tyson Y Herrold
Baker & Hostetler Llp (philadelphia)
contact info
Carl W Hittinger
Baker & Hostetler Llp (philadelphia)
contact info
Defendant
RealPage Inc
Represented By
Heidi B Bradley
Bradley Bernstein Sands LLP
contact info
Darin M Sands
Bradley Bernstein Sands Llp (portland)
contact info
Stephen Weissman
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Rose Associates Inc
Represented By
Richard P. Sybert
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Hannah Brown
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (denver Office)
contact info
Jacquelyne D. Fiala
Mainsail Lawyers
contact info
Defendant
Brookfield Properties Multifamily LLC
Represented By
Robert Dale Grimes
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Edward Steele Clayton, IV
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Jeffrey L. White
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jeremy E. Roller
Yarmuth Wilsdon Calfo PLLC
contact info
Jeremy A. Gunn
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Defendant
Greystar Management Services, LLC
Represented By
Joshua C. Cumby
Adams And Reese Llp (nashville-Church Street)
contact info
Vassi Iliadis
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
F. Laurens Brock
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Rocklan W. King, III
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Laura Penaranda
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Benjamin F. Holt
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC
Represented By
Kenneth Reinker
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Joseph M Kay
Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jeremy J. Calsyn
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Gabriel Navarro
Represented By
Breanna Le Van Engelen
Hagens, Berman, Sobol, Shapiro, Llp (seattle Office)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AvalonBay Communities Inc
Terminated: 07/13/2023
Represented By
Paul R Taylor
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Belinda S Lee
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Marcellus Williamson
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brookfield Residential Properties LLC
Terminated: 09/11/2023
Represented By
Robert Dale Grimes
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Edward Steele Clayton, IV
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Jeffrey L. White
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jeremy E. Roller
Yarmuth Wilsdon Calfo PLLC
contact info
Jeremy A. Gunn
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Defendant
Cushman & Wakefield Inc
Terminated: 09/11/2023
Represented By
Kenneth Reinker
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Joseph M Kay
Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jeremy J. Calsyn
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Terminated: 09/11/2023
Represented By
Joshua C. Cumby
Adams And Reese Llp (nashville-Church Street)
contact info
Vassi Iliadis
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
F. Laurens Brock
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Rocklan W. King, III
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Laura Penaranda
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Michael M. Maddigan
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Benjamin F. Holt
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
TF Cornerstone Inc
Terminated: 05/15/2023
Represented By
Kelly M Drew
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (spokane)
contact info
Brittney C Adams
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (spokane)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyler Kimbrough
Terminated: 10/04/2023
Represented By
Israel David
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Blake Hunter Yagman
Israel David LLC
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens, Berman, Sobol, Shapiro, Llp (seattle Office)
contact info
Breanna Le Van Engelen
Hagens, Berman, Sobol, Shapiro, Llp (seattle Office)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaina Silverman
Terminated: 02/17/2023
Represented By
Israel David
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Blake Hunter Yagman
Israel David LLC
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens, Berman, Sobol, Shapiro, Llp (seattle Office)
contact info
Breanna Le Van Engelen
Hagens, Berman, Sobol, Shapiro, Llp (seattle Office)
contact info

GPO Feb 13 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 20 Stipulated MOTION. The deadline for Defendants RealPage, Inc., Brookfield Residential Properties LLC, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Equity Residential, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, AvalonBay Communities, Inc., TF Cornerstone, Inc., and Rose Associates, Inc. to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby suspended and shall be set on the same date as the deadline ultimately established for Alvarez et al. v. RealPage, Inc. et al., No. 2:22-cv-01617 (W.D. Wash.). Plaintiffs and Defendants RealPage, Inc., Brookfield Residential Properties LLC, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Equity Residential, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, AvalonBay Communities, Inc., TF Cornerstone, Inc., and Rose Associates, Inc. shall file a joint status report with the Court by 4/21/2023. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (cc: Attorneys Calsyn, Hittinger, Maddigan, Lee, Roller, Sybert, Buchweitz, and Drew via ECF ad hoc) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/13/2023.]
GPO May 12 2023
ORDER: The Motion by all Plaintiffs to Establish Deadlines for the Submission of Leadership Applications and to Set a Schedule for the Exchange of a Proposed Joint Statement (Doc. No. 82) is RESERVED for discussion at the status conference on May 31, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/12/2023. (This order relates to ALL cases). (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk)
GPO May 25 2023
ORDER: By Order entered on April 19, 2023 (Doc. No. 3), the Court indicated that audio would be available at the Initial Status Conference on Wednesday, May 31, 2023, at 1:30 p.m., for those not attending in person and who do not wish to participate. Due to technical difficulties, audio will not be available. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 05/25/2023. (vk)
GPO May 25 2023
ORDER: By Order entered on April 19, 2023 (Doc. No. 3), the Court directed the parties to advise the Court by May 24, 2023, of the specific person(s) attending for that party. As the Court prepares for the Status Conference on May 31, 2023, it has found inconsistencies in the information provided. As such, it will be helpful for the parties, individually or collectively, to file a Notice identifying counsel who will attend for each party and who will speak on behalf of each party. The Court encourages the parties to authorize one lawyer to speak on behalf of several parties. The Notice(s) shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, May 25, 2023, with joint notices on behalf of multiple parties preferred. To the extent the Notice(s) is not timely filed, the Court may not be able to accommodate that party or counsel in the courtroom. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/25/2023. (vk)
GPO Jun 22 2023
ORDER: As requested, Defendants have filed a Notice of Number and Nature of Defendants' Anticipated Motions and Motion for Excess Pages (Doc. No. 297). The Court appreciates the thoughtfulness in Defendants filing and rules as follows: 1. Defendants may file a single joint 12(b)(6) motion for both the Multi-Family and Student Housing Consolidated Amended Complaints (Doc. Nos. 290 and 291) that tracks the issues in the Notice and Motion. 2. The following motions may be filed with page limits as set forth in the Order: LRO Users Motion to Dismiss, Agency Liability Motion to Dismiss, Thomas Bravo L.P. Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Transferor Court, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Transferee Court, and Motion to Enforce Class Action Waiver as to named plaintiff Brandon Watters. For each of the above motions counsel for the parties shall have a meet and confer before filing any such motion. 3. Defendants may file a Motion to Stay Discovery pending decision on the motion to dismiss with page limits as set forth in the Order. 4. Defendants' proposed Motion to Strike certain Plaintiffs class allegations or dismiss certain class claims is premature and reserved. See the Order for more specific information regarding rulings. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/22/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk)
GPO Jul 10 2023
ORDER granting (317) Motion for Entry of a Stipulation and Order. (A)s requested by the parties, the issue of personal jurisdiction and venue shall be deferred, without waiver of any arguments or objections, for 180 days from the date of this Order while Plaintiffs and Defendants continue their discussions. No later than 180 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall submit a status report to the Court either: (1) alerting the Court that issues of personal jurisdiction and venue have been resolved, or (2) proposing a briefing schedule for this Court to resolve any remaining motions concerning personal jurisdiction and venue with respect to the undersigned Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 07/10/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and ALL CASES(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
GPO Dec 28 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT regarding the Motion to Dismiss LRO Claims for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. No. 580). See Omnibus Order (Doc. No. 691) entered 12/28/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/28/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk) Modified on 12/28/2023 (vk).
GPO Dec 28 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT regarding Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Plead Agency Liability (Doc. No. 581). See Omnibus Order (Doc. No. 691) entered on 12/28/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/28/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk) Modified on 12/28/2023 (vk).
GPO Dec 28 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 587) and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 592). See Omnibus Order (Doc. No. 691) entered 12/28/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/28/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk) Modified on 12/28/2023 (vk).
GPO Dec 28 2023
o. 587) is GRANTED, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 592) is DENIED; (6) For the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. 689), Defendants' MotionOMNIBUS ORDER: This Omnibus Order resolves several motions to dismiss (Doc. Nos. 570, 572, 576, 580, 581, 587, 590, and 592), as follows: (1) For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. 685), Thoma Bravo Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 570) and the Student Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 572) are DENIED; (2) For the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. 686), TREV Management II LLC's Motion to Dismiss Student-Housing Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 576) is GRANTED, and TREV Management II LLC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the Student Complaint; (3) For the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. 687), the Motion to Dismiss LRO Claims for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. No. 580) is DENIED; (4) For the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. 688), Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Plead Agency Liability (Doc. No. 581) is DENIED; (5) For the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. No. 690), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. N to Enforce Class Action Waivers (Doc. No. 590) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to the class action waiver of Selena Vincin and her class action claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion is DENIED as to the class action waivers for Brandon Watters and Jeffrey Weaver. The motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as to the class action waivers for Joshua Kabisch and Meghan Cherry. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/28/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 et al.Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk) Modified on 12/28/2023 (vk).
GPO Jan 05 2024
ORDER: For the reasons discussed at the telephonic status conference with Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel Patrick Coughlin and Defendants' Liaison Lead Counsel Jay Srinivasan, the parties shall file their Joint Proposed Rule 26(f) Report and Case Management Order no later than February 9, 2024. An in-person hearing on the proposal is set for 1:00 p.m. on February 16, 2024. Additionally, as discussed, Plaintiffs shall disclose any third-party litigation funding sources no later than February 9, 2024. After this date, Plaintiffs must disclose any new third-party litigation funding sources without delay. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/5/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, February 22, 2024
203 203 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/22 2:01 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Parties stipulation dismissing without prejudice forty-five (45) Plaintiffs who were not in the Consolidated Complaints. (Doc. Nos. 527 and 530). The Parties agree and the Court concurs that the twenty-nine (29) actions affected by those dismissals should be closed. The Court granted Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Student Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and dismissed their claims (Doc. Nos. 587, 690 and 691). The following actions affected by the dismissals shall be closed. The Clerk shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the JPML. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/22/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792 (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
202 202 order Protective Order Wed 02/21 4:43 PM
STIPULATION AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/21/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
201 201 9 pgs order Order Tue 02/20 4:04 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER ON FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/20/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
200 200 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/20 3:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Protective Order by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order
199 199 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/20 11:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Terminating Certain Actions by MDL 3071 Defendants. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Srinivasan, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
198 198 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/19 3:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Federal Rule of Evidence 502 Order by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed 502(d) Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
197 197 order Case Management Order Fri 02/16 4:11 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this Court, and the Courts January 5, 2024, Order (ECF No. 693), and to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action, the Court orders that the following schedule shall govern these proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/16/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
196 196 15 pgs order Order Fri 02/16 3:55 PM
ORDER ON DEPOSITION PROTOCOL. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/16/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
195 195 19 pgs order Order Fri 02/16 3:52 PM
JOINT ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/16/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
194 194 5 pgs order Order Fri 02/16 3:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER ON EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/16/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/16 3:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2024. The Judge reviewed revisions to the Joint ESI Order, Order on Deposition Protocol, Stipulation and Order on Expert Discovery and the Case Management. (Court Reporter Lise Matthews.) Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Hearing lasted :22)(Seay, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
193 193 order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order Thu 02/15 4:26 PM
ORDER: This case is set for a telephonic status conference with Swathi Bojedla and Stephen Medlock for February 16, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. Ms. Bojedla and Mr. Medlock shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Joint Electronically Stored Information Order. The parties shall call 1-888-278-0296, and when prompted enter access code 6564835# to participate in the call. If a party has difficulty connecting, please contact chambers at 615-736-7013. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/15/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]