Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-50962

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:23-ap-05013
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Western Dental Services, Inc.
530 S. Main St. Ste. 600
Orange, CA 92868
Represented By
Western Dental Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
James Couch
1054 Ranchero Way Apt 3
San Jose, CA 95117
Represented By
Joseph Brian Angelo
Gale, Angelo, Johnson, & Patrick, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/09 11:54 AM
Adversary Case Closed 5:23-ap-5013. (pw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
18 18 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/08 3:03 PM
Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Western Dental Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff James Couch. Case Management Action due after 01/22/2024. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Mon 01/08 2:05 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+]. Pretrial conference dropped from calendar pursuant to the notice of settlement filed. (acr)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
court Hearing Dropped Mon 01/08 2:06 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+]. Two day trial dropped from calendar pursuant to the notice of settlement filed. (acr)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
Thursday, November 16, 2023
17 17 notice Notice Thu 11/16 4:57 PM
Notice Regarding Settlement with Defendant Western Dental Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff James Couch. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Tue 10/03 1:21 PM
Hearing Rescheduled Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2024 at 02:00 PM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Hearing rescheduled due to a court conflict. (acr)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/28 12:04 PM
Trial Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 2/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Trial scheduled for 2/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. (acr)
Related: [-]
15 15 audio audio Wed 07/26 9:55 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/25/2023 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 16646 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:20 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
court Hearing Held (Adv) Tue 07/25 10:48 AM
Hearing Held Related [+]. Appearances: Joseph Angelo on behalf of the plaintiff and Connie Tcheng for the defendant. The court will set a 2 day trial on 2/12 and 2/13/24 at 9:00 a.m. The pretrial conference will be held on 2/6/24 at 10:00 a.m. Fact discovery cut off deadline is 12/14/23 and any dispositive motion to be heard by 1/8/24. The court will prepare the order. (acr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 24, 2023
14 14 notice Notice Mon 07/24 6:48 PM
Notice Regarding Appearance Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9010 Filed by Defendant Western Dental Services, Inc.. (Tcheng, Connie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
13 13 misc Case Management Conference Statement Tue 07/18 4:59 PM
Joint Case Management Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Couch (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Monday, July 10, 2023
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 07/10 11:49 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Continued by the court prior to the hearing. (acr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 07, 2023
12 12 notice Notice Fri 07/07 12:43 PM
Notice Regarding appearance of Elliot Gale Filed by Plaintiff James Couch. (Gale, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
11 11 misc Case Management Conference Statement Wed 07/05 9:19 PM
Joint Case Management Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Couch (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 06/21 5:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Corporate Parent, Premier Dental Holdings, Inc. added to the case. Affiliate, NMP III Continuation Fund, LP., PDS Holdco, Inc., PDS Holdings I, Inc., PDS Holdings II, Inc., Premier Dental Services, Inc. added to the case. . Filed by Defendant Western Dental Services, Inc. (Diaz, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/21 4:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Western Dental Services, Inc.. (Diaz, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
8 8 order Stipulation Wed 06/14 2:20 PM
Order To Set Responsive Pleading Deadline Related [+]. (acr)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Defendant Western Dental Services, Inc.
Monday, June 12, 2023
7 7 stip Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/12 12:13 PM
Stipulation, to Set Responsive Pleading Deadline Filed by Defendant Western Dental Services, Inc.. (Diaz, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
6 6 misc Withdrawal of Document Wed 06/07 10:23 AM
Withdrawal of Documents Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Couch (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/30 9:11 AM
Motion (for Clerk to Enter Default Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7055) Filed by Plaintiff James Couch. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joe Angelo in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Clerk to Enter Default
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Filed April 18, 2023 Proof of Service
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/18 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Couch (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, April 14, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/14 12:00 PM
Summons Issued on Western Dental Services, Inc. Answer Due 5/15/2023 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. (myt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 order Discovery Fri 04/14 11:56 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (myt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/13 4:06 PM
Adversary case 23-05013 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) Complaint by James Joseph Couch against Western Dental Services, Inc.. Fee Waived. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet