Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:23-cv-00292
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2023
Re-opened:Oct 09, 2024
Terminated:Oct 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 12:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Eaton Corporation
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Henry Barrier
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Donna Cheek-Puls
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Brad Doe
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Gillam
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Angie Godsey
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Dustin Harlan
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Tim Hughes
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Klein
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
David Larkins
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Tom Litwicki
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Tyler Dozier
Represented By
Dorothy D McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
de Carlos Freeman
1507 N. Iowa St.
South Bend, IN 46628


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
44 44 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/13 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for de Carlos Freeman from 602 S Dundee, South Bend, IN 46619 to 6224 Peachtree St., Portage, MI 49024. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
43 43 misc Mail Returned Thu 02/13 5:45 PM
Mail Returned from de Carlos Freeman as Undeliverable - Unclaimed34 Status Report Order,35 Magistrate Consent Forms Sent. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 02/12 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for de Carlos Freeman from 1601 N Adams St, South Bend, IN 46628 to 602 S Dundee, South Bend, IN 46619. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
41 41 misc Status Report Fri 02/07 2:41 PM
STATUS REPORT of Defendant by Eaton Corporation. (Padgett, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
40 40 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/10 2:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING38 Motion for Extension of Time by Pla de Carlos Freeman. The deadline for Pla and Dfts to file status reports is extended to 2/7/2025, as requested. Pla is ADMONISHED to comply with all applicable rules and deadlines moving forward. Any future failure to do so may not be so easily accommodated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 1/10/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Status Report Fri 01/10 12:15 PM
STATUS REPORT by de Carlos Freeman. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 01/07 11:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff de Carlos Freeman. (kmt)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/07 11:11 AM
(Unsigned) NOTICE of Change of Address for de Carlos Freeman from 1519 Miami St, South Bend, IN 46613 to 1601 N Adams St, South Bend, IN 46628. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Padgett on behalf of All Defendants (Padgett, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
35 35 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated Thu 12/19 5:13 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/9/2025. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
34 34 order Status Report Order Thu 12/19 5:11 PM
ORDER FOR WRITTEN STATUS REPORTS: As a result, this Court ORDERS the unrepresented Plaintiff and the Defendants to separately prepare and file a brief status report, not to exceed three pages unless greater length is unavoidable by 01/17/2025. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send consent forms to all parties along with this order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 12/17/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/17 9:36 AM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 12/16 2:07 PM
(Unsigned) NOTICE of Change of Address by de Carlos Freeman to 1519 Miami St., South Bend, IN 46613. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
32 32 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 10/09 3:03 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to26 Notice of Appeal filed by de Carlos Freeman: We VACATE the judgment as to the claims of racial discrimination protected by Title VII and otherwise AFFIRM the judgment. And because the district court relinquished supplemental jurisdiction over the state-law claims, we note that our reinstatement of the Title VII claims revives jurisdiction over related state-law claims, if any. AFFIRMED in part, VACATED in part, and REMANDED.(jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Final Judgment,
Att: 2 Certified Nonprecedential Disposition
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
31 31 appeal FRAP 10 Certificate Wed 10/25 7:02 AM
FRAP 10 CERTIFICATE. No hearings held. (jld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
30 30 appeal Appeal Transcript Request Wed 10/25 7:01 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by de Carlos Freeman re26 Notice of Appeal. No hearings held.(jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
29 29 appeal Docketing Statement Wed 10/25 7:00 AM
Docketing Statement re:26 Notice of Appeal filed by de Carlos Freeman. (Forwarded to USCA)(jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, October 16, 2023
28 28 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 10/17 10:23 AM
USCA Case Number 23-2981 for26 Notice of Appeal filed by de Carlos Freeman. (jld)
Related: [-]
27 27 appeal Short Record Sent to USCA Mon 10/16 10:37 AM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re26 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (nae)
Related: [-]
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal - court user Mon 10/16 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Order Dismissing Case,24 Clerks Judgment by de Carlos Freeman.(nae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, October 12, 2023
25 25 service Proof of Service Thu 10/12 12:04 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to23 Order Dismissing Case,24 Clerks Judgment. (sej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
24 24 misc Clerks Judgment Thu 10/05 3:23 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party via cert # 7021 2720 0002 3685 6826) (ash)
Related: [-]
23 23 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/05 3:04 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss20 , dismissing the federal claims with prejudice and dismissing the state law claims without prejudice. this order terminates the case. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/5/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party via cert # 7021 2720 0002 3685 6826)(ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 08/18 1:45 PM
ORDER: To the extent you wish to respond to the motion, the Court ORDERS you to file your response by 9/7/2023. If you do not file a response, the court may rule on the motion summarily under N.D. Ind. Local Rule 7-1(d)(5) and may dismiss the case, if warranted. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 8/17/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
21 21 respm Brief in Support Mon 08/14 1:43 PM
BRIEF in Support of20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Angie Godsey, Donna Cheek-Puls, Dustin Harlan, Danielle Gillam, Eaton Corporation, Tom Litwicki, Andrew Klein, Henry Barrier, Tyler Dozier, David Larkins, Tim Hughes, Brad Doe. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/14 1:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Henry Barrier, Donna Cheek-Puls, Brad Doe, Tyler Dozier, Eaton Corporation, Danielle Gillam, Angie Godsey, Dustin Harlan, Tim Hughes, Andrew Klein, David Larkins, Tom Litwicki. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/14 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy D McDermott on behalf of Tyler Dozier (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/14 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gray Jeong on behalf of Tyler Dozier (Jeong, Gray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
17 17 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/01 11:33 AM
ORDER denying14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: In light of the filing of the16 Amended Complaint, the court denies the motion to dismiss as MOOT. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 8/1/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (dk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/31 12:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Henry Barrier, Donna Cheek-Puls, Brad Doe, Eaton Corporation, Danielle Gillam, Angie Godsey, Dustin Harlan, Tim Hughes, Andrew Klein, David Larkins, Tom Litwicki, filed by de Carlos Freeman.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
15 15 respm Brief in Support Tue 07/18 5:12 PM
BRIEF in Support of14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Angie Godsey, Donna Cheek-Puls, Dustin Harlan, Danielle Gillam, Eaton Corporation, Tom Litwicki, Andrew Klein, Henry Barrier, David Larkins, Brad Doe, Tim Hughes. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 07/18 5:10 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Henry Barrier, Donna Cheek-Puls, Brad Doe, Eaton Corporation, Danielle Gillam, Angie Godsey, Dustin Harlan, Tim Hughes, Andrew Klein, David Larkins, Tom Litwicki. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/21 11:22 AM
Reset Answer Deadline pursuant to Notice of Automatic Extension of Time13 . Answer due on or before 7/18/2023 for Defendants Eaton Corporation, Donna Cheek-Puls, David Larkins, Angie Godsey, Danielle Gillam, Brad Doe, Tom Litwicki, Andrew Klein, Tim Hughes, Dustin Harlan, and Henry Barrier. (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
13 13 notice Notice - Other Tue 06/20 3:38 PM
NOTICE by Henry Barrier, Donna Cheek-Puls, Brad Doe, Eaton Corporation, Danielle Gillam, Angie Godsey, Dustin Harlan, Tim Hughes, Andrew Klein, David Larkins, Tom Litwicki of Automatic Initial Extension of Time (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/20 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gray Jeong on behalf of Henry Barrier, Donna Cheek-Puls, Brad Doe, Danielle Gillam, Angie Godsey, Dustin Harlan, Tim Hughes, Andrew Klein, David Larkins, Tom Litwicki (Jeong, Gray)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/20 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy D McDermott on behalf of Henry Barrier, Donna Cheek-Puls, Brad Doe, Danielle Gillam, Angie Godsey, Dustin Harlan, Tim Hughes, Andrew Klein, David Larkins, Tom Litwicki (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/22 2:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
9 9 order Order Thu 05/18 9:40 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Eaton Corporation to file a new disclosure statement that complies with General Order 2023-06. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/18/23. (dk) (mailed to pro se party)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/03 12:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eaton Corporation. Eaton Corporation waiver sent on 4/20/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/03 12:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/03 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gray Jeong on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Jeong, Gray)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/03 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy D McDermott on behalf of Eaton Corporation (McDermott, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service - form will be generated Thu 04/20 10:41 AM
NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Eaton Corporation, Donna Cheek-Puls, David Larkins, Angie Godsey, Danielle Gillam, Brad Doe, Tom Litwicki, Andrew Klein, Tim Hughes, Dustin Harlan, and Henry Barrier. (Copies mailed to defendants at 2930 Foundation Drive, South Bend, IN 46628) Waiver of Service due by 5/22/2023. (sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order,
Att: 2 Complaint
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/20 10:22 AM
ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 ; DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case; and DIRECTS the clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and, if necessary, the United States Marshals Service to serve process on) the defendants at 2930 Foundation Drive, South Bend, Indiana, 46628 with a copy of this order and the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 04/19/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/14 4:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff de Carlos Freeman. (jld)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Pro Se Complaint Fri 04/14 4:02 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Eaton Corporation, filed by de Carlos Freeman.(jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits