Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:23-cv-01640
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2023
Terminated:Sep 06, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 8:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Aargon Collection Agency
Plaintiff
Santanna Benford
1414 Beechworth Ln
Acworth, GA 30101


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
11 11 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 09/06 10:21 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action without prejudice. (ces)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Wed 09/06 10:18 AM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the R&R as the opinion of this Court.7 . For the reasons stated in the R&R, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this case and DIRECTS the Clerk to close it. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/6/23. (ces)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/06 10:22 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Santanna Benford re11 Clerk's Judgment,10 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (ces)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/06 10:23 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
9 9 12 pgs order Order Mon 08/14 3:11 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 08/14 2:46 PM
ORDER for Service of7 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/14/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 08/14 2:45 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before this Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/14/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/14 2:47 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Santanna Benford re7 Final Report and Recommendation,8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/14 3:12 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Santanna Benford as to Santanna Benford re9 Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 08/09 2:44 PM
Submission of6 Order, Set Submission Deadline, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/21 11:34 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Santanna Benford re6 Order,5 Notice to Pro Se Plaintiff. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 07/21 11:33 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to provide the Court with a status update regarding their settlement efforts within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/20/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Notice to Pro Se Parties Fri 07/21 11:31 AM
NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/20/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 05/23 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Santanna Benford (ceo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Fri 04/28 9:09 AM
Return of Service Executed by Santanna Benford. Aargon Collection Agency served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/14 4:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Aargon Collection Agency. (kng)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/14 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Santanna Benford. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 00001170)(kng)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt