Utah District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00027
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 1:59 AM MDT
Defendant
Wilifred Robert Stevenson (1)
Represented By
Tessa Mary Hansen
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sirena Miller Wissler
Doj-Usao
contact info
Travis K. Elder
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2023 3:44 AM MDT
Friday, March 24, 2023
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. (alf) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
3 3 ORDER SETTING IN-PERSON HEARING OR TRIAL as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson Initial Appearance set for 3/28/2023 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/27/23.(ksm) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson. (alf) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
5 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 4 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/27/2023. No attached document. (alf) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
6 6 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson for 3/28/2023 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. (alf) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
Case unsealed as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson (lam) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
7 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT** PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson (rmd) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
8 8 Oral MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson. (lam) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Unseal Case as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/28/2023. (lam) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg: Initial Appearance/Attorney Appointment/Pretrial Conference as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson held on 3/28/2023. Defendant present and in custody. Rights and penalties explained. The defendant requests counsel. Financial affidavit provided. The court appoints the FPD office. Added attorney Tessa Mary Hansen for Wilifred Robert Stevenson. The court finds the case meets the threshold for a detention hearing and that a presumption of detention applies. The defendant requests that a detention hearing be set for a later date. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS pending the detention hearing. Court Reporter required N. Interpreter required N. Is this an In-person Hearing Y.( Arraignment set for 4/5/2023 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Detention Hearing set for 3/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Sirena Wissler, Attorney for Defendant: Tessa Hansen, FPD. Interpreter: Not Needed. Probation Officer: Wyatt Stanworth. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 2:00, Time End: 2:20, Room 8.400.) (lam) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
11 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson Tessa Mary Hansen for Wilifred Robert Stevenson appointed. No attached document. Representation shall continue for any post-sentencing activities initiated by the US Probation Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/28/2023.(lam) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
12 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson. No attached document. Detention Hearing set for 4/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/23/2023.(lam) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tessa Mary Hansen appearing for Wilifred Robert Stevenson (Hansen, Tessa) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
15 15 NOTICE OF FILING of 7th Street Treatment Acceptance Letter & Character Reference filed by Wilifred Robert Stevenson(Hansen, Tessa) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7th Street Treatment Acceptance Letter & Character Reference
Monday, April 03, 2023
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Detention Hearing as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson held on 4/3/2023. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. The Court hears argument from the parties regarding the issue of detention. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orders defendant detained in USMS custody pending resolution of this matter. Note: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case. Attorney for Plaintiff: Peter Reichman, Attorney for Defendant: Tessa Hansen, FPD. Interpreter: Not Needed. Probation Officer: Wyatt Stanworth. Court Reporter: Electronic. (Time Start: 2:04:24, Time End: 2:23:26, Room 8.400). (tls) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson. NOTE: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/03/2023. (tls) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler: Preliminary Hearing as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson held on 4/6/2023. Defendant is present with counsel and in custody. FBI Special Agent Brett Taylor is sworn and testifies. The parties address the Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds probable cause exists in this matter. Matter is set for arraignment. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sirena Wissler, Attorney for Defendant: Tessa Hansen, FPD. Interpreter: Not Needed. Court Reporter: Electronic. (Time Start: 12:37:05, Time End: 12:56:20, Room 8.400). (tls) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER SETTING HEARING OR TRIAL as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson. Arraignment set for 4/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 04/06/2023.(tls) [2:23-mj-00264-DAO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
20 20 INDICTMENT as to Wilifred Robert Stevenson (1) count(s) 1, 2. Assigned to Judge David Barlow. (mh)
Related: [-]