Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00110
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2023
Terminated:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Victor Cervantes (1)
Represented By
Andrenette Sullivan-FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Navid Alagheband Alband
The Alband Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 19 2023
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Victor Cervantes. Re: 22 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/19/2023) (sre)

Docket last updated: 10/10/2023 5:24 PM CDT
Monday, February 06, 2023
1 1 3 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Victor Cervantes (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
Arrest of Victor Cervantes (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
3 3 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Victor Cervantes held on 2/9/2023. Date of Arrest: 2/8/2023; deft executed financial affidavit; o/appointing FPD entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Preliminary & detention hearing set 2/14/23 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Ray; o/temp detention entered; deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Frank Gatto for Laura Montes; Defense - Andrenette Sullivan. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Mouret.) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Victor Cervantes (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Victor Cervantes. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 2/9/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Victor Cervantes (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Victor Cervantes. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 2/14/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 2/9/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Victor Cervantes: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 2/9/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/8/2023 as to Victor Cervantes. (dgt) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
9 9 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Navid Alagheband Alband (Clerk to Set Designation as: Retained) appearing for Victor Cervantes (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Alband, Navid) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
10 10 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Victor Cervantes held on 2/14/2023 ; Deft atty made oral motion to substitute; court grants oral motion to sub; FPD relieved from further representation; Govt witness DEA SA Christopher Biggs sworn and testified; Court finds PC; o/detention pending trial entered; Deft custody continued. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Navid Alagheband. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Treat.) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting6 Motion for Detention as to Victor Cervantes (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/14/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 3 pgs Joint MOTION to Continue Time to Indict filed by USA as to Victor Cervantes (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
14 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Victor Cervantes (1)until April 13, 2023 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(7(B)(I). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 3/7/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00100-BJ] (Entered: 03/07/2023)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
15 15 2 pgs FELONY INFORMATION with FORFEITURE NOTICE as to Victor Cervantes (1) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (sre)
Related: [-]