Consolidated
Lead case: 1:20-cv-04699

Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Case #: 1:23-cv-02248
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause02:431 Fed. Election Commission: Failure Enforce Compliance
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Case in other court:California Central, 2:22-cv-08613
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 3:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Beijing Douyin Information Service Co. Ltd
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
Represented By
Victor H. Jih
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati PC
contact info
Thomas Robert Wakefield
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Victor Jih
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati Professional Corporation
contact info
Samantha A. Machock
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Kelly Hope Yin
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati Professional Corporation
contact info
Anthony J Weibell
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Douyin Ltd.
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
Represented By
Victor H. Jih
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati PC
contact info
Thomas Robert Wakefield
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Victor Jih
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati Professional Corporation
contact info
Samantha A. Machock
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Kelly Hope Yin
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati Professional Corporation
contact info
Anthony J Weibell
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Austin Recht
Represented By
Roland Tellis
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Jay Lichter
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
Sterling Lynn Cluff
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
David Brian Fernandes, Jr.
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Donald W. Bivens
Don Bivens PLLC
contact info
Shannon E Royster
Baron And Budd PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2023 12:51 PM CDT
Friday, November 25, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34378510 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Attorney Roland K. Tellis added to party Austin Recht(pty:pla))(Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht, (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
8 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
11 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Beijing Douyin Information Service Co. Ltd, Bytedance Inc., Douyin Ltd., and TikTok Inc. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ByteDance Inc.,
Att: 2 Douyin Ltd.,
Att: 3 TikTok Inc.
12 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Don Bivens. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
13 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong re: Pro Hac Vice Application Due. The Court GRANTS an extension of time for counsel to file the necessary Pro Hac Vice documents to 12/16/2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
14 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Austin Recht, upon Defendant TikTok Inc served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Vang, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
15 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Austin Recht, upon Defendant Bytedance Inc. served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Vang, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Tellis, Roland) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
16 16 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anthony J Weibell on behalf of Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc (Attorney Anthony J Weibell added to party Bytedance Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony J Weibell added to party TikTok Inc(pty:dft))(Weibell, Anthony) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
18 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victor H. Jih counsel for Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc. Adding Victor Jih as counsel of record for TikTok Inc.; ByteDance Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TikTok Inc.; ByteDance Inc.. (Attorney Victor H. Jih added to party Bytedance Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Victor H. Jih added to party TikTok Inc(pty:dft))(Jih, Victor) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha A Machock counsel for Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc. Adding Samantha A. Machock as counsel of record for TiktTok Inc. and ByteDance Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Inc.. (Attorney Samantha A Machock added to party Bytedance Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha A Machock added to party TikTok Inc(pty:dft))(Machock, Samantha) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
20 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance,17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
21 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc, identifying TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., and ByteDance Ltd. (Weibell, Anthony) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Robert Wakefield counsel for Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc. Adding Thomas R. Wakefield as counsel of record for Defendants TikTok Inc. and Bytedance Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TikTok Inc. and Bytedance Inc.. (Attorney Thomas Robert Wakefield added to party Bytedance Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Robert Wakefield added to party TikTok Inc(pty:dft))(Wakefield, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
23 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald W. Bivens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Recht (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34480201) filed by Plaintiff Austin Recht. (Cluff, Sterling) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Bar Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
24 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly Hope Yin counsel for Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc. Adding Kelly H. Yin as counsel of record for TikTok Inc.; ByteDance Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TikTok Inc.; ByteDance Inc.. (Attorney Kelly Hope Yin added to party Bytedance Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Hope Yin added to party TikTok Inc(pty:dft))(Yin, Kelly) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
25 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald W. Bivens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Recht (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34480201)23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
26 26 ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Bivens, Donald W APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Austin Recht and the putative class, designating Cluff, Sterling L. as local counsel. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
27 27 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending JPML Ruling filed by Defendants Bytedance Inc., TikTok Inc.(Weibell, Anthony) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
28 28 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML RULING [ECF NO.27 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending JPML Ruling (ECF No. 27), and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the request. This case is STAYED pursuant to the following guidelines. All proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the requirement for anyparty to file a pleading, responsive pleading, or motion under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9,or 12 shall be STAYED in this action until further order of this Court, following a ruling by the JPML on Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate CTO-3 and his Motion for MDL Consolidation. However, such stay of this case shall be lifted if Defendants respond to any complaint in the related cases identified as potential tag-along actions in the JPML proceedings, during the pendency of Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate CTO-3 or his Motion for MDL Consolidation. The Parties shall promptly notify this Court of the JPMLs ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate CTO-3 and his Motion for MDL Consolidation. The Parties reserve all other rights. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
29 29 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2948, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Case transferred electronically. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 4/17/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
30 30 RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:22-cv-08613 (gcy)
Related: [-]