Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:23-cv-60720
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
EL CAMINO FORT LAUDERDALE, LLC
Represented By
Kyle Thomas Berglin
Boyd Richards Parker & Colonnelli, P.L.
contact info
Marcus Antonio Nielsen
Recor Rieber P.A.
contact info
Duchant Johnson
Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper Hochman, P.A.
contact info
Yvette Rose Lavelle
Boyd Richards Parker & Colonnelli, P.L.
contact info
Mediator
Howard Tescher
Tescher Mediation Group, Inc 401 E. Las Olas Blvd Suite 1400
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Plaintiff
DYLAN EDWARDS
Represented By
Jordan Lee Richards
Jordan Richards, PLLC
contact info
Michael Vincent Miller
Usa Employment Lawyers
contact info
Jake Slome Blumstein
Tripp Scott PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Julian Lorenzo
Represented By
Michael Vincent Miller
Usa Employment Lawyers
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Zaldeti
Represented By
Michael Vincent Miller
Usa Employment Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
59 59 3 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 01/17 11:11 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) The Joint Motion (DE50 ) is GRANTED:54 Joint MOTION for clarification53 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Dylan Edwards. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
58 58 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/10 9:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting57 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall file a Renewed Joint Motion for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement after the Courts ruling on the pending Motion for Clarification (DE54 ). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/10/2024. (am00)
Related: [-]
57 57 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/10 3:43 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Renewed Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement re53 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Dylan Edwards. Responses due by 1/24/2024.(Miller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order