Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Steven C Seeger
Case #: 1:23-cv-02392
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 3:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Netflix, Inc.
Represented By
Victoria Jane Noble
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Natalie J. Spears
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Jacqueline A, Giannini
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chike Antoine Ozah
Represented By
Victoria Jane Noble
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Natalie J. Spears
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Jacqueline A, Giannini
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Clarence Ivy Simmons, Jr.
Represented By
Victoria Jane Noble
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Natalie J. Spears
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Jacqueline A, Giannini
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Love
Represented By
Kristin Dvorsky Tauras
Mckenna, Storer, Rowe, White & Farrug
contact info

GPO Feb 27 2024
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 2/27/2024. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. 11) is hereby granted.. Mailed notice. (jjr, )

Docket last updated: 04/17/2023 4:21 PM CDT
Monday, April 17, 2023
1 1 8 pgs NOTICE of Removal from The Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, Law Division, case number (2023-L-000977) filed by Netflix, Inc., Chike Antoine Ozah, Clarence Ivy Simmons, Jr Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20547840.(Spears, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 57 pgs Exhibit 1 - State Court Records,
Att: 2 Declaration of Natalie J. Spears in Support of Removal
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spears, Natalie)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Netflix, Inc., Chike Antoine Ozah, Clarence Ivy Simmons, Jr by Natalie J. Spears (Spears, Natalie)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Netflix, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Spears, Natalie)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Netflix, Inc., Chike Antoine Ozah, Clarence Ivy Simmons, Jr by Jacqueline A, Giannini (Giannini, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Netflix, Inc., Chike Antoine Ozah, Clarence Ivy Simmons, Jr by Victoria Jane Noble (Noble, Victoria)
Related: [-]