Kansas District Court
Judge:Teresa J James
Referred: Teresa J James
Case #: 6:23-cv-01057
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 3:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Central Plastics, Inc.
811 W. First St. PO Box 903
McPherson, KS 67460
Represented By
Alan L. Rupe
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, Llp - Wichita
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerrod Stout
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Nathan Elliott
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Donald N. Peterson, II
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhonda Brunson
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Nathan Elliott
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Donald N. Peterson, II
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryce Seymour
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Nathan Elliott
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Donald N. Peterson, II
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Sykes
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Nathan Elliott
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info
Donald N. Peterson, II
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info

GPO May 22 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 44 the Parties' Joint Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Approval of Wage and Hour Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/22/2024. (hmg)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/26 10:35 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation 46 . (mls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
46 46 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/25 10:22 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes. (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
45 45 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 05/22 2:04 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting44 the Parties' Joint Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Approval of Wage and Hour Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/22/2024. (hmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
44 44 motion Settlement Thu 04/25 5:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Defendant Central Plastics, Inc. (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
43 43 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/28 12:35 PM
ORDER Upon being advised the parties have negotiated a settlement of this matter, the Court will hold in abeyance all remaining41 Amended Scheduling Order deadlines. At the request of counsel, the Court will set a deadline of April 25, 2024, for the parties to file a motion for settlement approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/28/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hmg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
42 42 order Consent & Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/15 10:59 AM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/15/2024. (ca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
41 41 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Mon 02/12 12:52 PM
SECOND AMENDED PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part and denying in part40 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion toAmend Scheduling Order. Phase I Discovery deadline 4/12/2024. Mediation deadline 4/11/2024. Mediation Notice filed or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 2/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/12/2024. (hmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
40 40 motion Amend Scheduling Order Wed 02/07 4:24 PM
Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Unopposed) by Defendant Central Plastics, Inc. Related [+] (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
39 39 notice Notice of Service Wed 02/07 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Central Plastics, Inc. of Supplemental Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Service Thu 02/01 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Jerrod Stout of Plaintiff Jerrod Stouts Responses to Defendants Discovery Requests (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
37 37 discov Amended Notice to Take Deposition Mon 01/29 3:52 PM
AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes of taking deposition of Caleb Houghton on 02/07/2024 (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
36 36 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 01/26 3:52 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes of taking deposition of Caleb Houghton on 02/07/2023 (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
35 35 order Mediation Minute Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/19 2:55 PM
MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - The Court has reviewed the parties' Confidential Settlement Reports and, because the parties indicate they have not yet exchanged good faith settlement proposals in accordance with the deadlines set by the Court and discovery is needed before doing so, the Court sets the following new deadlines: Plaintiffs to serve their good faith settlement offer(s) on Defendant by February 2, 2024; Defendant to serve its good faith settlement offer(s) on Plaintiffs by February 12, 2024; Mediation Notice Filed or updated Confidential Settlement Reports to the Court by February 23, 2024; and Mediation completion by April 5, 2024. Given that the Court has already entered an Amended Scheduling Order (ECF No. 29) granting the parties requested extension of all Scheduling Order deadlines by 90 days, no further extensions of these or any other deadlines in this case will be granted, absent the filing of a timely motion showing good cause for any requested extensions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/19/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/11 2:26 PM
ORDER granting33 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension of time, to January 25, 2024, in which to file a motion to compel with respect to Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories. Plaintiff should not anticipate any further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/09 5:33 PM
MOTION for extension of time To File Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes Related [+] (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Service Tue 01/02 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Central Plastics, Inc. of Discovery Requests (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
31 31 notice Notice of Service Fri 12/22 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Central Plastics, Inc. of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Service Thu 12/14 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Central Plastics, Inc. of Defendant's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Fri 11/17 3:49 PM
AMENDED PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER granting26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Phase I Discovery deadline 4/12/2024. Mediation deadline 3/18/2024. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 1/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/17/2023. (hmg)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Status Conference Fri 11/17 11:47 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2023. Amended Phase I Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
27 27 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/16 8:53 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE On the Court's own motion, a Status Conference is set for 11/17/2023 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James to discuss26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The parties must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/16/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hmg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
26 26 motion Amend Scheduling Order Fri 11/10 2:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jerrod Stout Related [+] (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
Monday, October 16, 2023
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 10/16 10:51 AM
ORDER granting24 Defendant Central Plastics, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Discovery Responses. Defendant Central Plastics, Inc., is hereby granted an extension of time, until November 12, 2023, to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories. Defendant is also granted an extension of time, until November 20, 2023, to respond to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/16/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
24 24 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/10 10:47 PM
MOTION for extension of time to submit discovery responses to Plaintiff's discovery requests by Defendant Central Plastics, Inc. Related [+] (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
23 23 notice Notice of Service Tue 10/10 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Central Plastics, Inc. of First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Service Thu 09/21 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes of Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production to Defendant (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Service Wed 09/13 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
20 20 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 08/23 1:18 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information, granting 19 Joint Motion Requesting Entry of a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/23/2023. (hmg)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Protective Order Wed 08/23 1:14 PM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on August 23, 2023. Related [+] (hmg)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/22 2:09 PM
PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Report EMAILED to Magistrate Judge by 11/15/2023. Mediation deadline 12/18/2023. Phase I Discovery deadline 1/12/2024. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/22/2023. (tvn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 08/08 10:36 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2023. Phase I Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Service Thu 08/03 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Rhonda Brunson, Bryce Seymour, Jerrod Stout, Jesse Sykes of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Service Thu 08/03 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Central Plastics, Inc. of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
14 14 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Mon 06/26 9:15 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2023 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. The parties must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/18/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/31/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/26/2023. (hmg)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/26 8:49 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Central Plastics, Inc..(Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 06/26 8:48 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of Central Plastics, Inc. (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Consent to Join Thu 06/01 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Jesse Sykes re1 Complaint (attorney) (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/26 10:05 AM
ORDER granting9 Defendant Central Plastic, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Central Plastics, Inc. is hereby granted an extension until June 26, 2023, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/26/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/25 6:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Central Plastics, Inc. Related [+] (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
8 8 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 05/25 6:35 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of Central Plastics, Inc.. (Rupe, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
7 7 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Thu 05/11 10:50 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/25/2023 for Defendant Central Plastics, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/11/2023. (jk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Consent to Join Fri 05/05 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Rhonda Brunson re1 Complaint (attorney) (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Consent to Join Fri 05/05 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Bryce Seymour re1 Complaint (attorney) (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
4 4 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 04/21 3:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jerrod Stout upon Central Plastics, Inc. served on 4/20/2023, answer due 5/11/2023 (Le, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Consent to Join Tue 04/18 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Jerrod Stout re1 Complaint (attorney) (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 04/18 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 04/18 3:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Plastics, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/17 5:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs And all others similarly situated, Jerrod Stout. (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Mon 04/17 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6038436.), filed by Jerrod Stout, And all others similarly situated.(McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]