West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 1:23-bk-00185
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Dismissed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Preston Urgent Care Family Practice, LLC
411 Morgantown St.
Kingwood, WV 26537
Represented By
Martin P. Sheehan
Sheehan & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 United States Courthouse 300 Virginia Street East
Charleston, WV 25301


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Sunday, June 23, 2024
130 130 court BNC Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 129 Order to Close Case
Friday, June 21, 2024
129 129 order Close Case Fri 06/21 8:28 AM
Order to Close Case. (stb)
Related: [-]
court Case Closed Fri 06/21 8:31 AM
Case Closed (stb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
128 128 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Case Trustee's Report of NoDistribution A-case dism or conv, no pln,fee awd recd Thu 06/20 3:31 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 14 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $1364407.33, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee Aaron C. Amore. (Amore, Aaron)
Related: [-]