California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 4:14-cv-04554
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2014
Terminated:Nov 30, 2017
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 2:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Khaled Monawar
Plaintiff
Lawrence V Longhi
Represented By
Tesfaye Wolde Tsadik
Law Offices Of Tesfaye Tsadik
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
98 98 ORDER. The Court will not consider any further filings in this case, as final judgment has been entered and the case is closed. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/6/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/6/2021 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
97 97 Letter from Lawrence Longhi. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
96 96 Letter from Lawrence V. Longhi. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]