Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:23-bk-13005
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2023
Claims Deadline:Jun 27, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Apr 10, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
OZ Naturals, LLC
1655 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Suite 805
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Aaron A Wernick
Wernick Law, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Saturday, April 05, 2025
250 250 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/06 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 249 Order Denying Motion For Judicial Assistance (Re: 244 ) (Tate, Racquel)
Thursday, April 03, 2025
249 249 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Thu 04/03 3:34 PM
Order Denying Motion For Judicial Assistance Related [+] (Tate, Racquel)
Related: [-] # 244