Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:23-cv-01721
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Terminated:May 24, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
TightLine Development, LLC
Plaintiff
Simplex Designs, LLC
Represented By
Matthew J. Rizzolo
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Brendan F. McLaughlin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Scott A. McKeown
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Alexis Ramsey
Ropes And Gray LLP
contact info
Coby Nixon
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
19 19 misc A.O. Form 120 Wed 05/24 11:29 AM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ane)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 05/24 11:22 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/24 11:23 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/23 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Simplex Designs, LLC (Nixon, Coby)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
17 17 30+ pgs order Order Fri 04/28 2:56 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/28/2023. (sap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
16 16 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/27 2:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexis N. Ramsey. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/27 2:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brendan F. McLaughlin. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/27 2:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Rizzolo. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/27 2:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott A. McKeown. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/27 2:12 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Scott A. McKeown re13 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/27 2:14 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Matthew J. Rizzolo re14 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/27 2:17 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brendan F. McLaughlin re15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/27 2:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alexis N. Ramsey re16 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/26 12:24 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:9 APPLICATION for Admission of Scott A. McKeown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556359). Attorney Scott A. McKeown added appearing on behalf of Simplex Designs, LLC. (rvb) Modified on 4/26/2023 applicant and local counsel's business address had typos in the application, i verified their correct addresses and approved (rvb)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/26 12:25 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew J. Rizzolo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556366). Attorney Matthew J. Rizzolo added appearing on behalf of Simplex Designs, LLC. (rvb)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/26 12:26 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Brendan F. McLaughlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556368). Attorney Brendan F. McLaughlin added appearing on behalf of Simplex Designs, LLC. (rvb)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/26 12:28 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexis N. Ramsey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556373). Attorney Alexis Ramsey added appearing on behalf of Simplex Designs, LLC. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/25 7:02 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Alexis N. Ramsey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556373).by Simplex Designs, LLC. (Nixon, Coby)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/25 6:59 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Brendan F. McLaughlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556368).by Simplex Designs, LLC. (Nixon, Coby)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/25 6:56 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew J. Rizzolo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556366).by Simplex Designs, LLC. (Nixon, Coby)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/25 6:54 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Scott A. McKeown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556359).by Simplex Designs, LLC. (Nixon, Coby)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 22, 2023
8 8 misc Letter re:83.1 Sat 04/22 6:54 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Alexis Ramsey. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter re:83.1 Sat 04/22 6:52 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brendan F. McLaughlin. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter re:83.1 Sat 04/22 6:52 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew J. Rizzolo. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Sat 04/22 6:51 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Scott A. McKeown. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/19 11:56 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to TightLine Development, LLC. (kng)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc A.O. Form 120 Tue 04/18 12:40 PM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of USPTO. (kng)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/18 12:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simplex Designs, LLC. (kng)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/18 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Simplex Designs, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12535755)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit A - US10751070,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Patent Dispute Letter Rivera Surgical,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet