Original Case: 3:22-cv-00721

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-55350
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Terminated:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 1:25 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
INNOV8TIVE NUTRITION, INC., a Texas Corporation
Represented By
Wendy Qiu
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Vito Anthony Costanzo
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LACORE NUTRACEUTICALS, a Texas corporation
Represented By
Wendy Qiu
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Vito Anthony Costanzo
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LACORE LABS, INC., a Texas corporation
Represented By
Wendy Qiu
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Vito Anthony Costanzo
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LACORE ENTERPRISES, LLC, a Texas corporation
Represented By
Wendy Qiu
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Vito Anthony Costanzo
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
YOUNGEVITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By
Eric Jordan Awerbuch
Youngevity International, Inc.
contact info
Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Emord & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/04/2024 12:55 AM PST
Monday, April 17, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Youngevity International, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/24/2023. Appellant Youngevity International, Inc. opening brief due 06/12/2023. Appellees Innov8tive Nutrition, Inc., LaCore Enterprises, LLC, LaCore Labs, Inc. and LaCore Nutraceuticals answering brief due 07/12/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12696840] (JBS) [Entered: 04/17/2023 01:27 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet