Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-01582
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Case in other court:Texas Northern, 4:22-cv-01057
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Individually and as Successor in Interest to Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Stephen Austin Jones
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Individually and as Successor in Interest to Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Stephen Austin Jones
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Plaintiff
Ann Ellison-Wood
Represented By
John Dale Sloan, Jr
Sloan Hatcher Perry Runge Robertson & Smith
contact info
Emma Roddy
Sloan, Hatcher, Perry, Runger, Robertson & Smith
contact info
T. Roe Frazier, II
Frazier PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
17 17 NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. CMO Nos. 1 - 24, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. For this case please see CMO No. 2 regarding Motions Practice pg. 19 at 41., "If a motion to remand is pending..." . Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE / NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference will be In-Person (absent further Order from the Court) set for 4/27/2023 10:00 AM. The conference will be conducted in Charleston Courtroom #1, U. S. Court House, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (A dial-in, listen only, number will also be available). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] and the ECF MDL Attorney Registration Form. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
16 16 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Northern (associated as of 4/13/2023), 4:22-cv-01057, Ann Ellison-Wood v. Chemguard Inc et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01582-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/19 7:38 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-01057. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
13 13 Finalized Conditional Transfer Order 2873: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2873, and that order has now been filed in the District of South Carolina. (saw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
12 12 NOTICE of Submission Regarding Transfer Order Issued by the Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation re:11 Order on Motion to Stay,,, filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
11 11 ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's non-response, having considered the motion, and noting that the MDL panel's briefing schedule indicates it will likely reach a decision regarding transfer in early-April (Defs.' Certificate of No Objection 1 n.1, ECF No.6 ), the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion (ECF No.4 ). The case and all associated deadlines are STAYED pending the MDL panel's transfer decision. Defendants are ORDERED to file a notice on the docket within seven days of the MDL panel's decision informing this Court of the outcome of that case. If no decision is reached before April 15, 2023, Defendants SHALL file a status report with the Court on that date and every 30 days thereafter until the MDL decision is issued. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to administratively close the case until subsequent motion by the parties or order of the Court. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/31/2023) (tjc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. (tjc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
10 10 MOTION to Strike9 Reply Brief or, In the Alternative, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Thursday, January 26, 2023
9 9 REPLY filed by Ann Ellison-Wood re:7 MOTION to Remand (Sloan, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D
Thursday, January 12, 2023
8 8 OBJECTION filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP re:7 MOTION to Remand (Jones, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3
Thursday, December 22, 2022
7 7 MOTION to Remand filed by Ann Ellison-Wood (Sloan, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
6 6 NOTICE of Certificate of No Objection to Defendants' Motion to Stay This Action re:5 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,4 MOTION to Stay this Action and to Vacate Existing Deadlines Pending Final Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order
Monday, December 05, 2022
5 5 ORDER re:4 ...To expedite resolution of this motion, and in view of the upcoming deadlines that will occur prior to this motions anticipated ripeness date, the Court ORDERS the following: 1. Plaintiffs response to Defendants motion is due on December 16, 2022. 2. Defendant may reply no later than December 23, 2022. 3. The deadlines in the Courts Order (ECF No.3 ) are temporarily STAYED pending the Courts resolution of the motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/5/2022) (wxc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
4 4 MOTION to Stay this Action and to Vacate Existing Deadlines Pending Final Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Conditional Order Transfer
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
3 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before December 28, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/30/2022) (mmw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
2 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13332194) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Persons
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (See doc1 for image) (bdb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/19/2023.]
Related: [-]