Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Heil, III
Case #: 6:23-cv-00129
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 4:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Kevin Clardy
Represented By
Jamison C. Whitson
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Howard T. Morrow
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Jordan L. Miller
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mark Hannah
Represented By
Alejandra J. Brigida
Oklahoma Attorney General (okc)
contact info
Devan A. Pederson
Oklahoma Attorney General (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Kasbaum
Represented By
Robert S. Lafferrandre
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Sheila G. Jessee
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Randall J. Wood
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Quentin Lee
Represented By
Robert S. Lafferrandre
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Sheila G. Jessee
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Randall J. Wood
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Defendant
McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By
Jamison C. Whitson
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Howard T. Morrow
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Jordan L. Miller
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Storey
Represented By
Robert S. Lafferrandre
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Sheila G. Jessee
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Randall J. Wood
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green (okc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Barrick
Represented By
Christopher L. Camp
Camp Law Firm
contact info
D. Mitchell Garrett, Jr.
Garrett Law
contact info

GPO Sep 25 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. (Re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss ) Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2023. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Oct 19 2023
ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III adopting 48 Report and Recommendation; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; terminating party McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners (Oklahoma) (kch, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Apr 11 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson (Re: 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings). Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2024. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, adopting 91 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson and denying 54 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (tlp, Chambers)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
220 220 order Ruling on Motion to Continue Hearing(s) Deadlines - Set/Reset All Motion and R&R Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Thu 05/01 9:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson granting219 Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Hearing. Accordingly, the Motion Hearing Related [+] is RESET from 5/14/2025 to 6/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. The Court shall hear arguments on the issue of whether the individual officers were acting under color of state law. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kevin Clardy;165 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Matthew Kasbaum and Quintin Lee;166 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kevin Storey;167 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Mark Hannah; and185 Joint Motion by Defendants Keven Storey and McCurtain County Sheriff Kevin Clardy to Deem Confessed Their Motions for Summary Judgment
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
219 219 motion Continue Hearing(s) Wed 04/30 2:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing(s) by Barbara Barrick Responses due by 5/14/2025(Garrett, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
218 218 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset All Motion and R&R Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Thu 04/24 8:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Motion Hearing Related [+] for 5/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. The Court shall hear arguments on the issue of whether the individual officers were acting under color of state law. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kevin Clardy;165 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Matthew Kasbaum and Quintin Lee;166 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kevin Storey;167 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Mark Hannah; and185 Joint Motion by Defendants Keven Storey and McCurtain County Sheriff Kevin Clardy to Deem Confessed Their Motions for Summary Judgment