Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Brooks G Severson
Case #: 6:23-cv-01064
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph Unger
ECF Notifications Only 100 N. Broadway Avenue, Apt. 490
Wichita, KS 67202
Defendant
West Hills Capital, LLC
Plaintiff
John Clifford Glahn
Represented By
David L Marcus
Bartle & Marcus, LLC
contact info

GPO Jul 26 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause by August 11, 2023, as to why the undersigned Magistrate Judge should not recommend that his claims be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) and/or Rule 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/26/2023. (tl)
GPO Apr 08 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Strike. The Court strikes Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as it pertains to Defendant West Hill Capital but not as it pertains to Defendant Unger. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/8/2024. (sz)

Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
49 49 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/26 11:44 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC. (Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
48 48 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/21 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by John Clifford Glahn (Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
47 47 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/20 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by West Hills Capital, LLC (Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
46 46 order Order Tue 02/18 10:32 AM
ORDER: The parties informed the Court this matter has resolved. (per joint status report emailed to Chambers on 2/14/2025). By 3/21/2025 , the parties are directed to either (a) file a stipulation of dismissal or (b) provide a joint status update to the Court. If no stipulation of dismissal is filed and no status update provided, the District Judge may close the case without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 2/18/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
45 45 notice Notice of Cancelled Hearing Tue 02/18 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Status Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
44 44 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 12/12 9:51 AM
ORDER granting 43 Motion to Continue. The Status Conference is continued to 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM via Telephone before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Counsel are directed to call 316-402-0044 and enter conference ID number 485 069 538 to participate in the conference. Based on the parties' representations that the case is close to settlement, the Court will continue the status conference one final time. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report to the Court by 2/14/2025 . The report should address the status of settlement negotiations, the status of the action in Delaware against the third-party defendants and proposals for prosecuting the claims against them considering the receivership and temporary restraining order entered against them. The parties are expected to confer prior to submitting the joint status report regarding a plan going forward. The status report should detail the efforts the parties have made to confer with each other and with the receiver's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 12/12/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Continue Thu 12/12 9:44 AM
MOTION to Continue. The parties jointly request a 60-day continuance of the status conference scheduled for December 17, 2024. (per 12/11/2024 joint status report emailed to Chambers) Related [+] (tl)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
42 42 order Order Tue 11/26 9:55 AM
ORDER CHANGING CONFERENCE CALL NUMBER FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES AND HEARINGS WITH JUDGE SEVERSON. Judge Severson's conference call number has changed. From this date going forward, please use only 316-402-0044, Conference ID 485 069 538, for all telephonic conferences and hearings with Judge Severson. The Court notes that a different system is being used for conference calls, and the parties will be placed in a waiting room prior to the start of the call. Although call participants may experience a period of silence, the parties should remain on the line. Previous orders may have directed the parties to call 888-363-4749 for conferences and hearings. From this date, do NOT call 888-363-4749 for any conferences or hearings with Judge Severson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 11/26/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
41 41 order Setting Status Conference Fri 10/18 11:31 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone (BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. By 12/12/2024 , the parties are ordered to submit a joint status report to Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 10/18/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Cancelled Hearing Fri 10/18 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Status Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 11:00 AM is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
39 39 order Setting Status Conference Tue 09/10 11:14 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone (BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report to the Magistrate Judge by 10/15/2024 . The status report may be emailed to Chambers and should include all the information discussed during the September 10, 2024 status conference, including the status of the action in Delaware against the third-party defendants and proposals for prosecuting the claims against them in light of the receivership and temporary restraining order entered against them. The parties are expected to confer prior to submitting the joint status report regarding a plan going forward. The status report should detail the efforts the parties have made to confer with each other and with the receiver's counsel. Ideally, the parties will be in position to submit a joint recommendation to the Court; however, the parties may submit separate proposals if no agreement can be reached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/10/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
38 38 minutes Status Conference Tue 09/10 10:57 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/10/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
37 37 order Setting Status Conference Wed 08/28 11:37 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 10:30 AM via Telephone (BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. In light of the "Notice of Receivership and Related Stay", Doc. 36, the Court sets this status conference to discuss with the parties how to proceed. The parties are encouraged to discuss a plan prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 8/28/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/28 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Receivership and Related Stay by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 50 pgs Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Cancelled Hearing Wed 08/07 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Status Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. Since the third-party defendants have been served, the Court cancels the status conference. The Court will enter an initial order once responsive pleadings have been filed. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 08/07 1:21 PM
ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- UPS by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC upon Argent Asset Group LLC served on 8/6/2024, answer due 8/27/2024(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
33 33 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 08/07 1:19 PM
ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- UPS by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC upon First State Depository Company, LLC served on 8/6/2024, answer due 8/27/2024(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, August 05, 2024
service Alias Summons Issued Mon 08/05 10:53 AM
Alias Summons Issued as to Argent Asset Group LLC, First State Depository Company, LLC. Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
32 32 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 07/31 3:24 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- UPS by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC upon Eric Higgins served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
31 31 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 07/31 3:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- UPS by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC upon Robert Leroy Higgins served on 7/30/2024, answer due 8/20/2024(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
service Alias Summons Issued Tue 07/30 4:04 PM
THIRD PARTY ALIAS SUMMONS re28 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT issued as to third party defendants Argent Asset Group LLC, First State Depository Company, LLC. Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for third party plaintiffs West Hills Capital, LLC and Joseph Unger for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
service Summons Issued Mon 07/29 10:48 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Argent Asset Group LLC, First State Depository Company, LLC, Eric Higgins, Robert Leroy Higgins. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
30 30 7 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 07/10 11:38 AM
ANSWER to23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims by John Clifford Glahn.(Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
29 29 order Setting Status Conference Tue 07/09 10:38 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone (BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. In light of the filing of the third-party complaint, the Court converts the scheduling conference to a status conference. The Status Conference will take place on the same date and time as the previously set scheduling conference. All related submission deadlines are suspended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 7/9/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
28 28 34 pgs cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 07/08 6:03 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against First State Depository Company, LLC, Argent Asset Group LLC, Robert Leroy Higgins, Eric Higgins, filed by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC.(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
27 27 misc Mail Returned Mon 07/01 11:59 AM
RETURN Mail received re: 20 Order, 21 Order Setting Status Conference, addressed to Joseph Unger. Not Remailed. (jal)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Mail Returned Mon 07/01 11:57 AM
RETURN Mail received re 19 Order Setting Status Conference, addressed to Joseph Unger. Not Remailed. (jal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
25 25 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Tue 06/25 10:52 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM by Telephone BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/18/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/29/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 6/25/24. (cc)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Cancelled Hearing Tue 06/25 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: In light of counsel's appearance on behalf of Defendants, the Status Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. An initial order to get this moving forward will be forthcoming. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
23 23 25 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 06/24 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against John Clifford Glahn by Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC.(Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 06/24 4:43 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Francis M. Schneider on behalf of Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC (Schneider, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
21 21 order Setting Status Conference Wed 05/22 4:21 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. The parties and/or counsel are instructed to call Judge Severson's conference line at 1-888-363-4749. The call participants will be prompted to enter an access code which is 5407703. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 5/22/2024. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Unger by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Wed 05/22 4:17 PM
ORDER: The deadline for Defendants West Hills Capital, LLC and Joseph Unger to answer or otherwise plead is extended to 6/24/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 5/22/2024. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Unger by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Re Pro Se Mailing Fri 05/24 12:30 PM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 20 Order, 21 Order Setting Status Conference mailed to Joseph Unger on 5/24/2024 by regular mail. (cc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
notice Notice Re Pro Se Mailing Mon 04/15 9:00 AM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 19 Order Setting Status Conference mailed to Joseph Unger on 4/15/2024 by regular mail. (cc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
19 19 order Setting Status Conference Wed 04/10 10:10 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court sets a status conference to discuss the current case posture, the status of Defendants' representation, and a plan of how to proceed with the case. The Status Conference is set for 5/22/2024 at 3:30 PM via Telephone before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. The parties and/or counsel are instructed to call Judge Severson's conference line at 1-888-363-4749. The call participants will be prompted to enter an access code which is 5407703. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 4/10/2024. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Unger by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
18 18 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Mon 04/08 2:37 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying8 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part12 Motion to Strike. The Court strikes Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as it pertains to Defendant West Hill Capital but not as it pertains to Defendant Unger. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/8/2024. (sz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
17 17 order Order Wed 03/27 9:26 AM
ORDER: The undersigned Magistrate Judge has reviewed the pending Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Docs. 8, 12. The Court, in its discretion, has determined that judicial economy is best served by staying discovery until after the District Judge rules on the Motion to Dismiss. If the case (or any portion thereof) survives the dispositive motion, Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to contact the Magistrate Judge's chambers within 10 days of the District Court's decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 3/27/2024. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Unger by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Re Pro Se Mailing Wed 03/27 10:07 AM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 17 Order mailed to Joseph Unger on 3/27/2024 by regular mail. (cc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
16 16 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/07 11:04 AM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff John Clifford Glahn re8 MOTION to Dismiss (Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
15 15 misc Docket Annotation Fri 09/01 11:39 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Defendant Joseph Unger is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 09/01 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Unger. (mam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
13 13 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/30 10:53 AM
RETURN mail received re 10 Minute Order addressed to Joseph Unger. Not remailed. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
12 12 4 pgs motion Strike Tue 08/29 11:50 AM
MOTION to Strike9 Memorandum in Support of Motion,8 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Strike Pro Se Filings by Joseph Unger on Behalf of West Hills Capital LLC by Plaintiff John Clifford Glahn Related [+] (Marcus, David)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 08/29 3:05 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 12 MOTION to Strike 9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 8 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Strike Pro Se Filings by Joseph Unger on Behalf of West Hills Capital LLC. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (tl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 08/25 11:25 AM
STATUS REPORT by John Clifford Glahn. (Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
10 10 order Reassigning Case - Minute Mon 08/21 8:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Brooks G. Severson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/21/23. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
9 9 11 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 08/18 11:21 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Joseph Unger and West Hills Capital, LLC. (mls)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 08/18 11:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Joseph Unger and West Hills Capital, LLC. (mls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
7 7 order Minute Order Wed 07/26 3:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER re6 Response to Order to show Cause filed by John Clifford Glahn. The Court has reviewed the response to the order to show cause as well as the recently filed summons returns (docs. 4, 5). The Court orders the Plaintiff to file a status report on the status of the case within 30 days. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/26/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 07/26 2:27 PM
RESPONSE re3 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff John Clifford Glahn(Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
5 5 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 07/26 2:24 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by John Clifford Glahn upon West Hills Capital, LLC served on 5/18/2023, answer due 6/8/2023 (Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 07/26 2:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by John Clifford Glahn upon Joseph Unger served on 5/18/2023, answer due 6/8/2023 (Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Show Cause Wed 07/26 1:54 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause by August 11, 2023 , as to why the undersigned Magistrate Judge should not recommend that his claims be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) and/or Rule 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/26/2023. (tl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/20 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Place of Trial by John Clifford Glahn (Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Thu 04/20 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6041340.), filed by John Clifford Glahn.(Marcus, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 04/20 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 04/20 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Documents (Exhibits) are not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 04/20 4:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Unger, West Hills Capital, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]