New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:23-cv-03337
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 01, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Haiku @ WP Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Alan Weinberger
Weinberger & Weinberger LLP
contact info
Joshua Sam Beldner
Tilton Beldner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Haiku Bistro 149 Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Alan Weinberger
Weinberger & Weinberger LLP
contact info
Joshua Sam Beldner
Tilton Beldner LLP
contact info
Defendant
JP White Plains Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Alan Weinberger
Weinberger & Weinberger LLP
contact info
Joshua Sam Beldner
Tilton Beldner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Soon Wah Lee
Represented By
Stuart Alan Weinberger
Weinberger & Weinberger LLP
contact info
Joshua Sam Beldner
Tilton Beldner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wei Li
Represented By
Aaron B. Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zhi Qiang Li
Represented By
Aaron B. Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Baozhong Yang
Represented By
Aaron B. Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 01, 2023
26 26 order Memo Endorsement Fri 09/01 2:50 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:25 Status Report filed by Zhi Qiang Li, Wei Li, Baozhong Yang. ENDORSEMENT: Having received no opposition ( or any response) from Defendants, the Court accepts the filing of the Amended Complaint and remands the case to state court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/1/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Remanded Out - State Court Fri 09/08 8:40 AM
CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E533710078309 on 9/7/23. (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Thu 08/31 8:30 PM
STATUS REPORT. Plaintiff's Status Report /gd Document filed by Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 05/31 3:51 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE re: Document No. 24 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Court's leave has not been granted. Incorrect court name. Amended Complaint was filed after the due date. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/30 8:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Zhi Qiang Li, Wei Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Amended Complaint (Redline Version),
Att: 2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Enforce Shareholders Liability,
Att: 3 Exhibit 03 Demand to Insepect Shared Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit 04 Document Preservation Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit 05 Notice of Lien and Assignment,
Att: 6 Exhibit 06 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal Under FLSA and NYLL,
Att: 7 Exhibit 07 Notice that Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited /gd
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
23 23 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/23 3:44 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND AND REMAND TO NEW YORK STATE SUPREME COURT: re:20 MOTION to Remand to State Court County of Westchester filed by Zhi Qiang Li, Wei Li, Baozhong Yang. ENDORSEMENT: Because Defendants have not yet answered the Complaint, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by no later than May 29, 2023. Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by no later than June 6, 2023. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2023., Responses due by 6/6/2023) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/23/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 20, 2023
22 22 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Sat 05/20 3:32 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Remand to State Court County of Westchester /rr . Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend and Remand to State Court /rr . Document filed by Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Sat 05/20 3:30 PM
DECLARATION of John Troy in Support re:20 MOTION to Remand to State Court County of Westchester /rr .. Document filed by Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ny sc 2022-66012 001 Summons with Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit ny sc 2022-66012 002 Supplemental Summons with Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Amended Complaint (no FLSA) (redlined),
Att: 4 Exhibit Amended Complaint (no FLSA) (clean) /rr
20 20 motion Remand to State Court Sat 05/20 3:27 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court County of Westchester /rr . Document filed by Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 05/20 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Schweitzer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 05/20 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tiffany Troy on behalf of Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 05/20 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Troy on behalf of Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
16 16 misc Letter Fri 05/12 12:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Josh Beldner dated May 12, 2023 re: Defendants' request for a conference in connection with request to file partial motion to dismiss. Document filed by Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
15 15 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 05/11 11:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order (Dkt 13) served on Troy Law PLLC on May 3, 2023. Document filed by Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/11 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Alan Weinberger on behalf of Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee..(Weinberger, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/03 2:50 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Josh Beldner dated May 3rd, 2023.,11 Amended Notice of Removal,. Granted. Also, Plaintiff's counsel is to file a notice of appearance forthwith. Defendants are requested to mail a copy of this memo endorsed document to Plaintiff's counsel. So Ordered. (All Defendants.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/3/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/03 12:23 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Josh Beldner dated May 3rd, 2023. Document filed by Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
11 11 notice Amended Notice of Removal Fri 04/28 2:26 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang; amending10 Notice of Removal,9 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by JP White Plains Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., Soon Wah Lee, Haiku @ WP Inc.. Related document:10 Notice of Removal,9 Notice of Removal,..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (state court complaint)
10 10 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/28 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 66012/2022..Document filed by JP White Plains Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., Soon Wah Lee, Haiku @ WP Inc...(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 04/28 2:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Sam Beldner to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct, REFILE THE INITIAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL CORRECTLY FIRST BEFORE FILING AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/27 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 66012/2022..Document filed by JP White Plains Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., Soon Wah Lee, Haiku @ WP Inc...(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (state court complaint)
8 8 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 04/27 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal papers served on Plaintiffs on April 26, 2023. Service was accepted by Troy Law PLLC. Document filed by Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 04/27 2:59 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Sam Beldner to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Amended Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the initial pleading deficiency must be cured before and Amended pleading could be accepted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
7 7 notice Amended Notice of Removal Wed 04/26 11:01 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Wei Li, Zhi Qiang Li, Baozhong Yang; amending1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by JP White Plains Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., Soon Wah Lee, Haiku @ WP Inc.. Related document:1 Notice of Removal,..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (state court complaint)
Friday, April 21, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 04/21 2:55 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Sam Beldner to RE-FILE re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Haiku @ WP Inc must be added again with alias; Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 04/21 2:57 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Sam Beldner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wei Li, Haiku Bistro 149, Inc., Haiku @ WP Inc., JP White Plains, Inc., Soonwah Lee. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/21 3:08 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/21 3:11 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/21 3:12 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/20 6:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/20 6:19 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JP White Plains Inc...(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/20 6:17 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Haiku Bistro 149 Inc...(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/20 6:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Haiku @ WP Inc...(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/20 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Sam Beldner on behalf of Haiku @ WP Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., JP White Plains Inc., Soon Wah Lee..(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/20 6:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 66012/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27636091).Document filed by JP White Plains Inc., Haiku Bistro 149 Inc., Soon Wah Lee, Haiku @ WP Inc...(Beldner, Joshua)
Related: [-]