Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:23-cv-00278
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Terminated:May 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 6:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Darrigan Investments LLC
Represented By
Alan F. Hamisch
Hamisch & Hurvitz, PLLC
contact info
Adam Allen
Allen & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Kava Culture Franchise Group Corp.
Represented By
Adam G. Wasch
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
Evan Matthew Goldman
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dar-Jkta Enterprises LLC
Terminated: 05/18/2023
Represented By
Alan F. Hamisch
Hamisch & Hurvitz, PLLC
contact info
Adam Allen
Allen & Associates
contact info
Defendant
David Darrigan
Terminated: 05/18/2023
Represented By
Alan F. Hamisch
Hamisch & Hurvitz, PLLC
contact info
Adam Allen
Allen & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Johnny Qubty
Terminated: 05/18/2023
Represented By
Alan F. Hamisch
Hamisch & Hurvitz, PLLC
contact info
Adam Allen
Allen & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 05, 2024
57 57 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Mon 02/05 12:46 PM
ORDER denying 54 Motion to Vacate Dismissal Without Prejudice, Reinstate Case Against Darrigan Investments, LLC, and Permit Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint Against Darrigan Investments, LLC, Only. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/5/2024. (RHG)
Related: [-]