Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Myong J Joun
Case #: 1:23-cv-10856
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Re-opened:Jul 25, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Care Access Research LLC
Represented By
Douglas T. Schwarz
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Keri L. Engelman
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Liliya Perelman Kramer
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aisha Bennett
Represented By
Kristen M. Hurley
Gordon Law Group
contact info
William Clif Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Philip J. Gordon
Gordon Law Group
contact info
Carter Tilden Hastings
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Alyssa White
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Andrew W. Dunlap
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
57 57 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 03/17 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Liliya Perelman Kramer (Kramer, Liliya)
Related: [-]