Village of Monroe v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01584 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 7:23-cv-02398 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 4:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20, fictitious names whose present identities are unknown
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
as successor in interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Village of Monroe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 4/17/2023), 7:23-cv-02398, Village of Monroe v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01584-RMG (sshe, ) | |
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:23-cv-02398. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicole G. McDonough. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., BASF CORPORATION, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, Clariant Corporation, as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |