Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:23-cv-00854
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 4:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Tkay Walker
Defendant
Jewel Tankard
Defendant
Stacia Pierce
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Jalene Mack
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Defendant
Tara Lewis
Defendant
Gene Ford
Defendant
Tava Ventures Inc
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Defendant
Tava Lifestyle LLC
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Defendant
Keith Williams
Defendant
LaCore Nutraceuticals LLC
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
LaCore Logistics LLC
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
LaCore Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Janella Simpson
Defendant
LaChelle Pierre
Defendant
Nina Moorer
Defendant
Kenneth Lloyd
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Chante Lloyd
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Terry LaCore
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Kevin D Harris
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Jenifer Grace
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Kelly J Kubasta
Ferguson Braswell & Fraser PC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony T Fleming
Defendant
Clavon Browning
Defendant
Ark Ventures
Represented By
Ryan D. Marrone
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonja N Williams
Represented By
Keron Andre Wright
Burke Bogdanowicz PLLC
contact info
Nnamdi McKenny Anozie
Anozie, LLP
contact info
Ashana Stanley
Anozie LLP
contact info
Jourdan Jackson Dukes
Anozie LLP
contact info
Kailen West Grant
Anozie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ShockTheory DLV Inc
Represented By
Keron Andre Wright
Burke Bogdanowicz PLLC
contact info
Nnamdi McKenny Anozie
Anozie, LLP
contact info
Ashana Stanley
Anozie LLP
contact info
Jourdan Jackson Dukes
Anozie LLP
contact info
Kailen West Grant
Anozie LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 29 2023
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants' 26 Second Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike should be granted on the grounds that venue is improper in the Northern District of Texas. In the interest of justice, the District Court should transfer this case to the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/29/2023) (mcrd)
GPO Feb 14 2024
ORDER Accepting 26 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the court grants Tava Defendants Second Motion (Doc. 26) only to the extent that venue is improper; and transfers it to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas as the proper venue under 28 U.S.C. § 1400(a). Further, the court denies without prejudice all other pending motions (Docs. 28, 42, 44, 46, 48, 50, 52, 57, 62, 63, and 66). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/14/2024) (cfk)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
69 69 4 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Wed 02/14 12:35 PM
ORDER Accepting26 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the court grants Tava Defendants Second Motion (Doc.26 ) only to the extent that venue is improper; and transfers it to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas as the proper venue under 28 U.S.C. § 1400(a). Further, the court denies without prejudice all other pending motions (Docs.28 ,42 ,44 ,46 ,48 ,50 ,52 ,57 ,62 ,63 , and66 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/14/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry) Wed 02/14 12:40 PM
Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER Related [+]. Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (cfk)
Related: [-] cord does not contain restricted documents
misc Acknowledgment of Case Transfer Wed 02/14 4:35 PM
Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division as case number 4:24-cv-00122. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
68 68 respm Reply Tue 02/13 6:49 PM
REPLY filed by LaChelle Pierre, Janella Simpson, Jewel Tankard re:62 MOTION to Dismiss (Marrone, Ryan)
Related: [-]