California Southern District Court
Judge:William Q Hayes
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:23-cv-00734
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Terminated:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:02 PM PDT
Defendant
Premier Money Source, Inc.
Represented By
Sydney Muraoka
Prenovost, Normandin, Dawe & Rocha
contact info
Karel Rocha
Prenovost, Normandin, Dawe & Rocha
contact info
Defendant
Duane Wellhoefer
Represented By
Sydney Muraoka
Prenovost, Normandin, Dawe & Rocha
contact info
Karel Rocha
Prenovost, Normandin, Dawe & Rocha
contact info
Plaintiff
Thane Charman
individual 2270 Boundary Street
San Diego, CA 92104


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 21, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/22 8:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/21/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 08/29 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Settlement stipulation by Thane Charman (Charman, Thane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
14 14 minutes ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 08/23 2:48 PM
Minute Order Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. The August 30, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are hereby VACATED. (no document attached) (src)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Declaration Wed 08/23 2:37 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas J. Prenovost, Jr. Regarding Settlement of Matter with Plaintiff, Thane Charman by Defendants Premier Money Source, Inc., Duane Wellhoefer. (Muraoka, Sydney)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/23 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thane Charman With Prejudice (Charman, Thane)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Wed 08/23 11:08 AM
ORDER Regarding Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) and Case Management Conference (CMC). On July 10, 2023, the Court set this matter for an ENE and CMC, and directed the parties to submit confidential settlement statements, and file a Joint Discovery Plan, by August 16, 2023. As of the date of this Order, the parties have not filed a Joint Discovery Plan, nor has the Court received any settlement conference statements. The parties are ORDERED to submit all materials and information required by the Court's July 10, 2023 Order [Dkt. No. 10] by not later than 5:00 p.m. on August 24, 2023 . Late submissions will not be accepted. (no document attached) (src)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
10 10 8 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 07/10 1:05 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/30/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 7/10/2023.(alns)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/07 10:19 AM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint, of Thane Charman by Premier Money Source, Inc., Duane Wellhoefer.(Rocha, Karel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 07/06 8:31 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint of Thane Charman by Premier Money Source, Inc., Duane Wellhoefer.(Rocha, Karel)Attorney Karel Rocha added to party Premier Money Source, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Karel Rocha added to party Duane Wellhoefer(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 21, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 05/21 11:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thane Charman. All Defendants served.(Charman, Thane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, May 04, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/04 3:09 PM
Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (alns) (alns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/03 9:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Thane Charman, duane wellhoefe.New Summons Requested. (Charman, Thane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, April 28, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents Mon 05/01 9:01 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/28/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
3 3 motion Leave to Electronically File Documents Mon 04/24 2:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Thane Charman. (ggv)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/24 2:09 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ggv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/24 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Premier Money Source, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 145057.), filed by Thane Charman. The new case number is 3:23-cv-734-WQH-DDL. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Charman,Thane)(ggv) . (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/24/2023) (ggv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt