Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:23-cv-00844
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Clyde
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Turner
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner
contact info
Susan M. Deaton
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner
contact info
Dawn M. Frick
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner
contact info
Defendant
James Snell
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Turner
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner
contact info
Susan M. Deaton
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner
contact info
Dawn M. Frick
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner
contact info
Plaintiff
Cody Delgado
Represented By
Peter G. Pattakos
contact info
Zoran Balac
Pattakos Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 26, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/26 9:26 AM
Stipulation and Order dismissing case with prejudice . Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/26/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs notice Stipulation (atty event) Mon 08/26 8:12 AM
Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by City of Clyde, James Snell. (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
order Order Thu 08/01 10:11 AM
Order: [non-document] The Court has been advised that this case is settled. Accordingly, parties to file dismissal entry by 9/16/2024. Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/1/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 2 pgs notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Tue 06/11 10:05 AM
First Notice to take Deposition of Justin LaBenne on June 12 2024 filed by Cody Delgado. (Pattakos, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 05/28 3:51 PM
Minutes of Telephone Status Conference [non-document] held on 5/28/2024 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Peter G. Pattakos; Defendants appeared by attorneys Dawn M. Frick and Susan M. Deaton. Case management deadlines are amended as follows: Discovery now due by 6/28/2024; Dispositive motions now due by 8/16/2024. Time: 20 minutes. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
14 14 2 pgs notice Status Report (atty event) Wed 05/15 11:17 AM
Joint Status Report OF PARTIES filed by City of Clyde, James Snell. (Deaton, Susan)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 05/15 12:49 PM
Order: [non-document] Telephone Status Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/15/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/10 1:51 PM
Notice of Video Deposition of James Snell on April 23, 2024 filed by Cody Delgado. (Balac, Zoran)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 02/07 4:27 PM
Minutes of Telephone Status Conference [non-document] held on 2/7/2024 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff failed to appear; Defendants appeared by attorney Dawn M. Frick. The Court attempted to reach Plaintiff's counsel, who failed to appear. Parties to file Joint Status Report by 5/15/2024. Time: 15 minutes. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
order Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Thu 11/30 1:25 PM
Minutes of Telephone Status Conference [non-document] held on 11/30/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Peter G. Pattakos; Defendants appeared by attorney Susan M. Deaton. Case management deadlines are amended as follows: Plaintiffs' expert disclosures now due by 3/5/2024; Defendants' expert disclosures now due by 4/5/2024; Discovery now due by 5/6/2024; Dispositive motions now due by 6/5/2024. Further Telephone Status Conference SET for 2/7/2024 at 2:00 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to parties in advance of the call. Time: 20 minutes. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Tue 11/28 5:09 PM
Notice to take Deposition of Cody Delgado on December 20, 2023 filed by All Defendants. (Deaton, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
11 11 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Thu 07/27 12:37 PM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference held via telephone on 7/26/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Peter G. Pattakos; Defendants appeared by attorneys Dawn M. Frick and Susan M. Deaton. Case is assigned to proceed on the STANDARD track. Parties to exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures by 8/7/2023. Discovery cut-off dates: Plaintiff's expert disclosures by 1/5/2024; Defendants' expert disclosures by 2/5/2024; Liability and Damages by 3/5/2024. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 8/31/2023. Dispositive motions by 4/5/2024. Telephone Status Conference SET for 11/30/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to parties in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/27/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
10 10 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 07/20 8:22 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - Parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge filed by City of Clyde, James Snell. (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
9 9 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 06/30 1:08 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held via telephone on 7/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/30/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/20 4:38 PM
Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by City of Clyde, James Snell. (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 06/20 4:13 PM
Attorney Appearance by Dawn M. Frick filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 06/20 3:31 PM
Attorney Appearance by Susan M. Deaton filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Deaton, Susan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 06/20 3:29 PM
Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey C. Turner filed by on behalf of City of Clyde, James Snell. (Turner, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/08 3:31 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cody Delgado. City of Clyde waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/24/2023 filed on behalf of Cody Delgado (Balac, Zoran)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/08 3:30 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cody Delgado. James Snell waiver sent on 4/21/2023, answer due 6/20/2023 filed on behalf of Cody Delgado (Balac, Zoran)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 04/24 8:13 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons issued none were provided. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 04/24 8:08 AM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 04/24 8:11 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Mon 04/24 8:14 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/21 9:12 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11959101.. Filed by CODY DELGADO. (Pattakos, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet