Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:23-mj-00042
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Terminated:Apr 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2023 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Daniel Phillip Beckman (1)
Represented By
FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alison Dawn Dunning
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info
David Luna
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info
Gregg Robert Coonrod
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2023 6:34 AM CDT
Thursday, April 20, 2023
ARREST of Daniel P Beckman (Borneman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case Alison Dawn Dunning and David Luna for USA added. (Chorny, Traci)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs RULE 5 as to Daniel P Beckman (1). (Borneman, Sara)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Daniel P Beckman. (Chorny, Traci)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Daniel P Beckman held on 4/20/2023. Appearance entered by FPD for Daniel P Beckman on behalf of defendant. All parties present and ready for hearing. Defendant appears in person, in custody, with counsel. Defendant advised of the charges, penalties, and rights. Defendant is charged by way of Indictment out of the Southern District of West Virginia. Court summarizes the charges and penalties in the Indictment. Defendant requests the Court to appoint counsel for him. Completed Financial Affidavit presented to the Court; Federal Public Defender's Office and Travis Poindexter are appointed to represent the Defendant in this case.As required by Rule 5(f), the Court orders the United States to produce all exculpatory evidence to the Defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, disciplinary action, and contempt proceedings. Defendant advised of his rights pursuant to Rule 5. Completed waiver presented to the Court. Court questions defendant regarding signed waiver. The Government has filed a motion for detention. Defendant requests detention hearing be held in the Western District of Missouri. Defendant was advised she would remain in custody of the US Marshals pending that hearing. The Court finds the defendant voluntarily waives his right to an Identity hearing. Court directs waiver to be filed. Detention Hearing set for 4/25/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. Counsel appearing for USA: Gregg Coonrod. Counsel appearing for Defendant: Travis Poindexter. Time in court: 2:52 p.m. to 3:06 p.m.. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Sara Borneman, 816-512-5774. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Borneman, Sara)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION to appoint counsel by Daniel P Beckman. (Borneman, Sara)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 motion to appoint counsel FPD for Daniel P Beckman appointed. Signed on 4/20/2023 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Borneman, Sara)
Related: [-]